EP3803282 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CLOUD BASED CENTRALIZED GAS FLOW MONITORING AND CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saudi Arabian Oil Company 1 Eastern Avenue Dhahran 31311 / SA | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AL-ABDULWAHED, Abdulrazaq 1 Eastern Avenue Dhahran, 31311 / SA | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/15] | Williams, Michael David Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 19734959.0 | 31.05.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019US34988 | Priority number, date | US201815994666 | 31.05.2018 Original published format: US201815994666 | [2021/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019232429 | Date: | 05.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3803282 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/44, G01F1/50, G01F1/74, G01F15/00, G01F15/02, G01F15/04, G01F15/06, G01F15/08, G01F25/00, E21B43/00, G01F15/063, E21B43/12, E21B47/10, G01F25/10 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
G01F1/44 (EP,US);
G01F25/15 (US);
E21B43/12 (EP);
E21B47/10 (EP,US);
G01F1/50 (EP);
G01F1/74 (EP);
G01F15/005 (EP);
G01F15/024 (EP);
G01F15/046 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/15] | G01F1/44, G01F1/50, G01F1/74, G01F15/00, G01F15/02, G01F15/04, G01F15/06, G01F15/08, G01F25/00, E21B43/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR CLOUD-BASIERTEN ZENTRALISIERTEN GASFLUSSÜBERWACHUNG UND -STEUERUNG | [2021/15] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CLOUD BASED CENTRALIZED GAS FLOW MONITORING AND CONTROL | [2021/15] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE SURVEILLANCE ET DE COMMANDE DE FLUX DE GAZ CENTRALISÉ EN NUAGE | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 22.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/36] | 19.04.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2008300792 (LAKHANI IQBAL [CA], et al) [A] 2-4,19,20* paragraphs [0041] , [0042] , [0048] , [0062] *; | [I]US2010023269 (YUSTI GERMAN [GB], et al) [I] 1-20 * paragraphs [0054] , [0060] - [0063] - [0078] , [0129] , [0132]; figures 1,2 * |