EP3810722 - 3D PRINTING BUILD MATERIALS AND SUPPORT MATERIALS COMPRISING A PHOSPHOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3D Systems, Inc. 333 Three D Systems Circle Rock Hill, SC 29730 / US | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Bo 28608 Sw Morningside Avenue Wilsonville, OR 97070 / US | 02 /
THOMAS, Jule, W. 1750 Killarney Jr. West Linn, OR 97068 / US | 03 /
PARKER, Mark, Raymond 3615 Hassalo Portland, OR 97232 / US | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2021/17] | Application number, filing date | 19735015.0 | 13.06.2019 | [2021/17] | WO2019US36964 | Priority number, date | US201862688779P | 22.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862688779 P | [2021/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019245845 | Date: | 26.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3810722 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/02, B33Y70/00, C09D11/12, C09D11/32 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
B33Y70/00 (EP,US);
B29C64/40 (EP,US);
C08K5/0041 (US);
C08K5/357 (US);
C08L33/08 (US);
C08L33/10 (US);
C08L71/02 (US);
C08L91/06 (US);
C09D11/101 (EP);
C09D11/102 (EP);
C09D11/12 (EP);
C09D11/34 (EP);
C09D11/38 (EP);
C09K11/02 (EP);
B29C64/112 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Title | German: | 3D-DRUCKAUFBAUMATERIALIEN UND TRÄGERMATERIALIEN MIT EINEM LEUCHTSTOFF | [2021/17] | English: | 3D PRINTING BUILD MATERIALS AND SUPPORT MATERIALS COMPRISING A PHOSPHOR | [2021/17] | French: | MATÉRIAUX DE CONSTRUCTION ET MATÉRIAUX DE SUPPORT POUR IMPRESSION 3D COMPRENANT UN PHOSPHORE | [2021/17] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 22.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2010086683 (BIRAU MARIA M [CA], et al); | [I]US2010288194 (STOCKWELL JOHN [US], et al); | [XI]WO2016129613 (UNITIKA LTD [JP]); | [Y]WO2017207514 (PHILIPS LIGHTING HOLDING BV [NL]); | [Y]US2018050501 (TALYANSKY VITALY [US], et al); | [Y]US2018071998 (CHOPRA NAVEEN [CA], et al) | by applicant | EP0114982 | EP0133908 | EP0223587 | US4751102 | US4772530 | US4772541 | US5904889 | US6558606 |