|
04.01.2024 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2023 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2023 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.01.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.01.2023 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.01.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.01.2023 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.01.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.08.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.08.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.08.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
110 |
|
29.08.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
110 |
|
22.08.2022 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2022 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2022 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2021 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.07.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.07.2021 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.07.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2021 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2021 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.01.2021 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2021 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2021 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2021 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2021 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2021 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2021 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2021 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2021 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2021 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2021 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2021 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2021 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2021 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2021 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
30.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2020 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.01.2020 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
138 |
|
19.12.2019 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.12.2019 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
110 |
|
30.08.2019 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
30.08.2019 |
Incoming letter related to ISA procedure |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
15.07.2019 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.07.2019 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.07.2019 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
01.07.2019 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
01.07.2019 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
68 |
|
01.07.2019 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
36 |
|
01.07.2019 |
Fee calculation sheet for an international application |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.07.2019 |
Invitation to Correct Defects in the International Application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
01.07.2019 |
Notification Concerning Payment of Prescribed Fees (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
01.07.2019 |
Notification of the International Application Number and of the International Filing Date (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.07.2019 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
8 |