EP3801148 - A SYSTEM FOR PRODUCING BEVERAGES FROM SINGLE-SERVE CAPSULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 18.12.2024 [2024/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAGA COFFEE S.p.A. Via Roma 24 24030 Valbrembo (BG) / IT | For all designated states Koninklijke Douwe Egberts B.V. Vleutensevaart 35 3532 AD Utrecht / NL | [2023/05] |
Former [2022/33] | For all designated states SAGA COFFEE S.p.A. Via Roma 24 24030 Valbremo (BG) / IT | ||
For all designated states Koninklijke Douwe Egberts B.V. Vleutensevaart 35 3532 AD Utrecht / NL | |||
Former [2021/15] | For all designated states SAGA COFFEE S.p.A. Località Casona 1066 40041 Gaggio Montano (BO) / IT | ||
For all designated states Koninklijke Douwe Egberts B.V. Vleutensevaart 35 3532 AD Utrecht / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASTELLANI, Andrea c/o Saga Coffee S.p.A. Localita' Casona, 1066 40041 Gaggio Montano (BO) / IT | [2023/05] |
Former [2021/15] | 01 /
CASTELLANI, Andrea c/o Saga Coffee S.p.A. Localita' Casona, 1066 40041 Gaggio Montano (BO) / IT | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A., et al Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2021/15] | Giannini, Manuela, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 19735392.3 | 29.05.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019IB54447 | Priority number, date | IT20180005819 | 29.05.2018 Original published format: IT201800005819 | [2021/15] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019229670 | Date: | 05.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3801148 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3801148 | Date: | 01.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/36, A47J31/46, A47J31/44 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
A47J31/3633 (EP,US);
A47J31/36 (RU);
A47J31/407 (US);
A47J31/4403 (EP);
A47J31/469 (EP,US);
A47J31/4407 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GETRÄNKEN AUS EINZELPORTIONSKAPSELN | [2021/15] | English: | A SYSTEM FOR PRODUCING BEVERAGES FROM SINGLE-SERVE CAPSULES | [2021/15] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PRODUCTION DE BOISSONS À PARTIR DE CAPSULES À USAGE UNIQUE | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 24.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.02.2023 | BG | 01.02.2023 | CZ | 01.02.2023 | DK | 01.02.2023 | EE | 01.02.2023 | FI | 01.02.2023 | HR | 01.02.2023 | LT | 01.02.2023 | LV | 01.02.2023 | MC | 01.02.2023 | PL | 01.02.2023 | RO | 01.02.2023 | RS | 01.02.2023 | SI | 01.02.2023 | SK | 01.02.2023 | SM | 01.02.2023 | NO | 01.05.2023 | GR | 02.05.2023 | IE | 29.05.2023 | LU | 29.05.2023 | BE | 31.05.2023 | IS | 01.06.2023 | PT | 01.06.2023 | [2024/51] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
CZ | 01.02.2023 | ||
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
MC | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RO | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SI | 01.02.2023 | ||
SK | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IE | 29.05.2023 | ||
LU | 29.05.2023 | ||
BE | 31.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
CZ | 01.02.2023 | ||
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
MC | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RO | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SI | 01.02.2023 | ||
SK | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IE | 29.05.2023 | ||
LU | 29.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
CZ | 01.02.2023 | ||
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
MC | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RO | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SI | 01.02.2023 | ||
SK | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
LU | 29.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
CZ | 01.02.2023 | ||
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
MC | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RO | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SK | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
LU | 29.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
CZ | 01.02.2023 | ||
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RO | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SK | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
CZ | 01.02.2023 | ||
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RO | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 01.02.2023 | |
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 01.02.2023 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2001011502 (BONANNO FRANCESCO [IT]) [Y] 1-7 * figures 5-8 * * page 2, paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0054] * * the whole document * [A] 8,9; | [A]WO2006045536 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [A] 2 * figure 11 * * page 18, line 22 - page 19, line 4 * * the whole document *; | [A]WO2009115474 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [A] 6 * figure 4 * * page 4, paragraph 4 * * the whole document *; | [YA]CN101606824 (YUDONG JING [CN]) [Y] 1-7 * figures 2, 4, 8 * * page 8 * * the whole document * [A] 8,9; | [YA]EP2380471 (CIXI TCOFI ELECTRIC CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 4 * figure 2 * * column 6, paragraph [0017] - column 7 * * the whole document * [A] 1-3,5-9; | [YA]WO2018026273 (DOUWE EGBERTS BV [NL]) [Y] 1-7 * figures 1A-8B * * page 1, lines 1-4 * * page 2, line 18 - page 3, line 9 * * page 4, line 3 - line 9 * * page 9, line 15 - page 11, line 13 * * page 11, line 20 - page 12, line 4 * * page 16, line 19 - line 20 * * page 17, line 20 - page 18, line 7 * [A] 8,9; | [A]EP3313243 (SAGA COFFEE S P A [IT]) [A] 8,9* figure 1 * | Examination | CN106175458 |