EP3797351 - METHOD TO STORE PROGRAMS FOR OPERATOR INTERFACE AND THE MANAGEMENT OF AUTOMATION MACHINES AND/OR PLANTS AND CORRESPONDING SOFTWARE PRODUCT, OR PROJECT FORMAT, FOR THE EXECUTION OF THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | 21.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASEM S.r.l. Via Buia 4 33011 Artegna / IT | [2021/23] |
Former [2021/13] | For all designated states Asem S.p.A. Via Buia 4 33011 Artegna / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICCIO, Alberto Via Aldo Moro, 5 37139 VERONA / IT | 02 /
FUMAGALLI, Maurizio Via Mazzini, 49 20821 MEDA / IT | [2021/13] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/13] | Application number, filing date | 19735413.7 | 21.05.2019 | [2021/13] | WO2019IT50111 | Priority number, date | IT20180005547 | 21.05.2018 Original published format: IT201800005547 | [2021/13] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019224855 | Date: | 28.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3797351 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F8/65, G06F8/654, G06F8/71 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
G06F8/65 (EP,US);
G05B19/056 (US);
G06F8/654 (EP);
G05B2219/13004 (US);
G06F8/71 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SPEICHERN VON PROGRAMMEN FÜR EINE BEDIENERSCHNITTSTELLE UND VERWALTUNG VON AUTOMATIONSMASCHINEN UND / ODER -ANLAGEN UND ENTSPRECHENDES SOFTWAREPRODUKT ODER PROJEKTFORMAT ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [2021/13] | English: | METHOD TO STORE PROGRAMS FOR OPERATOR INTERFACE AND THE MANAGEMENT OF AUTOMATION MACHINES AND/OR PLANTS AND CORRESPONDING SOFTWARE PRODUCT, OR PROJECT FORMAT, FOR THE EXECUTION OF THE METHOD | [2021/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE STOCKAGE DE PROGRAMMES POUR UNE INTERFACE OPÉRATEUR ET GESTION D'AUTOMATISATION DE MACHINES ET/OU D'INSTALLATIONS ET PRODUIT LOGICIEL, OU FORMAT DE PROJET, CORRESPONDANT, POUR L'EXÉCUTION DU PROCÉDÉ | [2021/13] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/13] | 21.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2007240096 (PONTOPPIDAN MICHAEL F [DK], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0009] - [0010] - [0060] * * figure 5 *[I] 2-10; | [XI]US2011239190 (MUELLER DOUGLAS [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9,10 * figures 4, 5 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0 11] , [0 30] - [0031] - [0 38] , [0 40] , [0 57] , [0 59] - [0060] - [0 65] , [0 68] * [I] 7,8; | [XI]EP2746931 (SOFTWARE AG [DE]) [X] 1 * figures 1 ,2 * * paragraphs [0043] - [0051] * [I] 2-10 |