EP3735240 - SOLID SELF-EMUSLIFYING CANNABINOID COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ICDPharma Ltd 33 Alon St 9979700 Carme-Yosef / IL | [2020/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRIEDMAN, Doron 33 Alon Street 9979700 Carme-Yosef / IL | [2020/46] | Representative(s) | Paulraj, Leonita Theresa AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/46] | Paulraj, Leonita Theresa A.A. Thornton & Co. 15 Old Bailey London EC4M 7EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 19735737.9 | 02.01.2019 | [2020/46] | WO2019IL50009 | Priority number, date | US201862613202P | 03.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862613202 P | [2020/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019135225 | Date: | 11.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3735240 | Date: | 11.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/352, A61K36/185, A61K9/107, A61K9/00, A61K9/20, A61K9/28 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
A61K36/185 (EP,US);
A61K9/1075 (EP,US);
A61K31/05 (EP,US);
A61K31/352 (EP,US);
A61K47/02 (US);
A61K47/14 (US);
A61K47/32 (US);
A61K47/38 (US);
A61K47/44 (US);
A61K9/0056 (EP,US);
A61K9/006 (EP,US);
A61K9/16 (US);
A61K9/2054 (EP);
A61K9/2846 (EP,US);
A61K9/2853 (US);
A61K9/4816 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/46] | A61K31/352, A61K36/185, A61K9/107 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/46] | Title | German: | FESTE SELBSTEMULGIERENDE CANNABINOID-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2020/46] | English: | SOLID SELF-EMUSLIFYING CANNABINOID COMPOSITIONS | [2020/46] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE CANNABINOÏDES AUTO-EMULSIFIANTES SOLIDES | [2020/46] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/46] | 16.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/52] | 24.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/52] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 16.05.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 16.05.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.05.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 16.05.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 16.05.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.05.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2014357708 (MURTY SANTOS B [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0076] * * claims 1-20 * * examples 1-17 *; | [Y]US2002136752 (WHITTLE BRIAN A [GB], et al) [Y] 1-15 * example 6 * * paragraph [0020] * * claims 1-12 *; | [Y]WO2017149392 (ANAVI-GOFFER SHARON [IL]) [Y] 1-15 * example 1 * * page 51, line 7 - page 52, line 22 * * claims 1-8 *; | [Y]WO2012033478 (MURTY PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * examples 1-16 * * claims 1-20 * | International search | [XY]US2016015683 (MCCARTY JOHN A [US]) [X] 1-8 * Entire document, especially Abstract, para [0011]-[0014], [0019], [0030], [0032], [0034], [0043], [0047], [0052] * [Y] 14-17; | [Y]US2016279073 (DONSKY MARC [US], et al) [Y] 14-17 * Entire document, especially Abstract, para [0012]-[0013], [0027], [0034], [0040], [0046], [0049], [0052], [0064], [0072] *; | [Y]US2013281523 (LETENDRE PETER [US], et al) [Y] 17 * Entire document, especially para [0030], [0048], [0124], [0160] *; | [A] - JAISWAL et al., "Nanoemulsion: an advanced mode of drug delivery system", Biotech, (20140000), vol. 5, no. 2, pages 123 - 127, XP055371108 [A] 1 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s13205-014-0214-0 | [A] - YOO et al., "Terpenoids as Potential Anti-Alzheimer's Disease Therapeutics", Molecules, (20120000), vol. 17, pages 3524 - 3538, XP055620427 [A] 14 * . * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/molecules17033524 | [A] - RUSSO, E. B., "Taming THC: potential cannabis synergy and phytocannabinoid terpenoid entourage effects", British Journal of Pharmacology, (20110000), vol. 163, pages 1344 - 1364, XP055420723 [A] 15-17 * . * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1476-5381.2011.01238.x |