EP3826715 - BEAM PATH BASED PATIENT POSITIONING AND MONITORING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brainlab AG Olof-Palme-Straße 9 81829 München / DE | [2021/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAISER, Hagen c/o Brainlab AG Olof-Palme-Straße 9 81829 München / DE | 02 /
STEAD, Michael c/o Brainlab AG Olof-Palme-Straße 9 81829 München / DE | [2021/22] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/22] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19736382.3 | 08.07.2019 | [2021/22] | WO2019EP68274 | Priority number, date | WO2018EP70062 | 24.07.2018 Original published format: PCT/EP2018/070062 | [2021/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020020623 | Date: | 30.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3826715 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/10 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
A61N5/10 (EP);
A61N5/1049 (EP,US);
A61N5/107 (US);
A61N2005/105 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/22] | Title | German: | STRAHLENGANGBASIERTE PATIENTENPOSITIONIERUNG UND -ÜBERWACHUNG | [2021/22] | English: | BEAM PATH BASED PATIENT POSITIONING AND MONITORING | [2021/22] | French: | POSITIONNEMENT ET SURVEILLANCE DE PATIENT SUR LA BASE D'UN TRAJET DE FAISCEAU | [2021/22] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/22] | 07.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2006020195 (FALCO TONY [CA], et al) [Y] 2-7* paragraphs [0030] , [0 31] *; | [XYI]EP2098169 (LASER APPLIKATIONAN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,8,9,11-15 * paragraphs [0004] , [0 10] - [0012] - [0 20] - [0023] - [0 30] - [0033] * * figures 3, 4 * [Y] 2-7 [I] 10 |