EP3802052 - MOLD FOR A SUPPORT ELEMENT, FOR EXAMPLE A SADDLE FOR VEHICLES, AND SUPPORT ELEMENT OBTAINABLE WITH SUCH A MOLD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.06.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Selle Royal Group S.p.A. Via Vittorio Emanuele 119 36050 Pozzoleone (VI) / IT | [2023/04] |
Former [2021/18] | For all designated states Selle Royal S.p.A. Via Vittorio Emanuele 119 36050 Pozzoleone (Vicenza) / IT | ||
Former [2021/15] | For all designated states Selle Royal S.p.A. Via Vittorio Emanuele 119 36050 Pozzoleone (Vicenza) / IT | ||
For all designated states Malfatti, Marco Via Vittorio Emanuele 119 36050 Pozzoleone (VI) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIGOLIN, Barbara c/o Selle Royal S.p.A. Via Vittorio Emanuele, 119 36050 Pozzoleone (Vicenza) / IT | 02 /
MALFATTI, Marco c/o Selle Royal S.p.A. Via Vittorio Emanuele, 119 36050 Pozzoleone (Vicenza) / IT | [2021/18] |
Former [2021/15] | 01 /
BIGOLIN, Barbara c/o Selle Royal S.p.A. Via Vittorio Emanuele, 119 36050 Pozzoleone (Vicenza) / IT | Representative(s) | Feltrinelli, Secondo Andrea APTA S.r.l. Patent Department Via Ca' di Cozzi, 41 37124 Verona / IT | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 19736499.5 | 23.05.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019IB54270 | Priority number, date | IT20180005920 | 31.05.2018 Original published format: IT201800005920 | [2021/15] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019229596 | Date: | 05.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3802052 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3802052 | Date: | 31.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/44, B29C33/44, B62J1/00, B29C45/40, B29L31/30 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
B29C33/442 (EP);
B29C45/4435 (EP);
B29C45/4005 (EP);
B29L2031/3094 (EP);
B62J1/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FORM FÜR EIN STÜTZELEMENT, Z.B. EINEN SATTEL FÜR FAHRZEUGE, UND MIT EINER SOLCHEN FORM ERHÄLTLICHES STÜTZELEMENT | [2022/25] | English: | MOLD FOR A SUPPORT ELEMENT, FOR EXAMPLE A SADDLE FOR VEHICLES, AND SUPPORT ELEMENT OBTAINABLE WITH SUCH A MOLD | [2021/15] | French: | MOULE POUR UN ÉLÉMENT DE SUPPORT, PAR EXEMPLE UNE SELLE POUR VÉHICULES, ET ÉLÉMENT DE SUPPORT POUVANT ÊTRE OBTENU AVEC UN TEL MOULE | [2022/25] |
Former [2021/15] | FORM FÜR EIN TRÄGERELEMENT, BEISPIELSWEISE EINEN SATTEL FÜR FAHRZEUGE, UND MIT EINER SOLCHEN FORM HERSTELLBARES TRÄGERELEMENT | ||
Former [2021/15] | MOULE POUR ÉLÉMENT DE SUPPORT, PAR EXEMPLE SELLE POUR VÉHICULES, ET ÉLÉMENT DE SUPPORT POUVANT ÊTRE OBTENU AVEC UN TEL MOULE | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 23.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22155532.9 / EP4011595 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2224248 (POWELL HENRY DEREK); | [A]EP2085302 (INT BICYCLE PRODUCTS CORP [TW]); | [XI]DE102015111537 (FVV GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [XI]US2017246771 (BELLIARD SYLVAIN [FR]); | [XI]US2017246770 (BELLIARD SYLVAIN [FR]) |