EP3714510 - ARRAY-FED REFLECTOR ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Defence and Space Limited Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage Hertfordshire SG1 2AS / GB | For all designated states Airbus Defence and Space SAS 51-61 Route de Verneuil 78130 Les Mureaux / FR | [2020/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STIRLAND, Simon c/o Airbus Defence and Space Limited Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2AS / GB | 02 /
FRAGNOL, Denis c/o Airbus Defence and Space SAS 51-61 route de Verneuil 78130 Les Mureaux / FR | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/40] | Hewett, Jonathan Michael Richard, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 19737143.8 | 12.07.2019 | [2020/40] | WO2019EP68880 | Priority number, date | GB20180011459 | 12.07.2018 Original published format: GB 201811459 | EP20180290107 | 25.09.2018 Original published format: EP 18290107 | [2020/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020012007 | Date: | 16.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3714510 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3714510 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q19/17, H01Q1/12, H01Q15/14, H01Q1/28, H01Q3/16 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
H01Q19/17 (EP,US);
H01Q1/1264 (EP);
H01Q1/288 (EP,US);
H01Q15/147 (EP,US);
H01Q3/16 (EP,US);
H01Q3/18 (US);
H01Q3/20 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/40] | H01Q19/17, H01Q1/12, H01Q15/14, H01Q1/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GRUPPENGESPEISTE REFLEKTORANTENNE | [2020/44] | English: | ARRAY-FED REFLECTOR ANTENNA | [2020/40] | French: | ANTENNE À RÉFLECTEUR ALIMENTÉE PAR RÉSEAU | [2020/44] |
Former [2020/40] | GRUPPENANTENNENGESPEISTE REFLEKTORANTENNE | ||
Former [2020/40] | ANTENNE À RÉFLECTEUR ALIMENTÉ PAR RÉSEAU | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/40] | 23.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 20.09.2022 | Observations by third parties | 03.05.2024 | Observations by third parties | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.01.2022
25.01.2022
ADMISSIBLE Thales Tour Carpe Diem Place des Corolles, Esplanade Nord 92400 Courbevoie / FR Opponent's representative Atout PI Laplace Immeuble Up On 25 Boulevard Romain Rolland CS 40072 75685 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.01.2022
25.01.2022
ADMISSIBLE Thales Tour Carpe Diem Place des Corolles, Esplanade Nord 92400 Courbevoie / FR Opponent's representative Marks & Clerk France Immeuble "Visium" 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | 04.02.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.06.2022 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 01.06.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.08.2023 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 13.10.2023 | Appeal received No. T1834/23 | 13.10.2023 | Payment of appeal fee | 12.12.2023 | Statement of grounds filed |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.07.2019 | AL | 21.04.2021 | AT | 21.04.2021 | CY | 21.04.2021 | CZ | 21.04.2021 | DK | 21.04.2021 | EE | 21.04.2021 | FI | 21.04.2021 | HR | 21.04.2021 | LT | 21.04.2021 | LV | 21.04.2021 | MC | 21.04.2021 | MK | 21.04.2021 | NL | 21.04.2021 | PL | 21.04.2021 | RO | 21.04.2021 | RS | 21.04.2021 | SE | 21.04.2021 | SI | 21.04.2021 | SK | 21.04.2021 | SM | 21.04.2021 | TR | 21.04.2021 | IE | 12.07.2021 | LU | 12.07.2021 | BG | 21.07.2021 | NO | 21.07.2021 | GR | 22.07.2021 | BE | 31.07.2021 | IS | 21.08.2021 | PT | 23.08.2021 | CH | 31.07.2022 | LI | 31.07.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 12.07.2019 | |
AL | 21.04.2021 | ||
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
MK | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 12.07.2021 | ||
LU | 12.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 12.07.2019 | |
AL | 21.04.2021 | ||
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 12.07.2021 | ||
LU | 12.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 12.07.2021 | ||
LU | 12.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 12.07.2021 | ||
LU | 12.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 12.07.2021 | ||
LU | 12.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 12.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 12.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 12.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 12.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0845833 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * column 3, line 9 - column 4, line 26 * * column 6, line 1 - column 8, line 23 *; | [A]WO0207256 (BOEING CO [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 3, line 2 - page 4, line 2 * * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 14 * * page 7, line 16 - page 10, line 20 * * page 13, line 1 - page 16, line 17 *; | [XYI]US2004189538 (RAO SUDHAKAR K [US], et al) [X] 1,4,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0008] - [0 14] - [0016] - [0 32] - [0042] - [0 60] - [0061] * [Y] 5,8 [I] 2,3; | [Y]US2017338556 (YI JACK [US], et al) [Y] 5,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0016] - [0 38] - [0055] - [0 64] - [0070] *; | [A] - COOLEY MICHAEL, "Phased Array Fed Reflector (PAFR) antenna architectures for space-based sensors", 2015 IEEE AEROSPACE CONFERENCE, IEEE, doi:10.1109/AERO.2015.7118963, ISBN 978-1-4799-5379-0, (20150307), pages 1 - 11, (20150605), XP032782891 [A] 1-8 * abstract * * Section 2.A * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/AERO.2015.7118963 | other | WO2018190794 | Opposition | US4562441 | JPH05273340 | JPH0637535 | JPH0832346 | EP0845834 | US6414646 | US6580399 | US2004108961 | US2004189538 | JP2006304196 | EP1902492 | FR2947103 | FR2956927 | US2012229355 | US2014333491 | US2017338556 | WO2018190794 | - MAJED KOUBEISSI, "Etude d'antennes multifaisceaux à base d'une nouvelle topologie de matrice de Butler Conception du dispositif de commande associé", Thèse, (20070000), pages 1 - 295, XP055889719 | - Anonymous, "Reflector (antenna)", Wikipedia, (20180606), pages 1 - 3, URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Reflector_(ant 6 juin 2018 enna)&oldid=844659298, XP055889733 |