EP3861214 - PUMP GROUP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, CH, FR, GB | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Industrie Saleri Italo S.P.A. Via Ruca 406 Frazione San Sebastiano 25065 Lumezzane, Brescia / IT | [2021/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SURACE, Alfonso c/o INDUSTRIE SALERI ITALO S.P.A. Via Ruca 406 Frazione San Sebastiano 25065 Lumezzane, Brescia / IT | 02 /
PEDERSOLI, Marco c/o INDUSTRIE SALERI ITALO S.P.A. Via Ruca 406 Frazione San Sebastiano 25065 Lumezzane, Brescia / IT | [2022/50] |
Former [2021/32] | 01 /
SURACE, Alfonso c/o INDUSTRIE SALERI ITALO S.P.A. Via Ruca, 406 Frazione San Sebastiano 25065 Lumezzane, Brescia / IT | ||
02 /
PEDERSOLI, Marco c/o INDUSTRIE SALERI ITALO S.P.A. Via Ruca, 406 Frazione San Sebastiano 25065 Lumezzane, Brescia / IT | Representative(s) | Gamba, Alessandro Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria, 11 25122 Brescia / IT | [2021/32] | Application number, filing date | 19737246.9 | 14.06.2019 | [2021/32] | WO2019IB54983 | Priority number, date | IT20180009201 | 05.10.2018 Original published format: IT201800009201 | [2021/32] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020070562 | Date: | 09.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3861214 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3861214 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/58, H02K9/197 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
H02K9/197 (EP);
F01P3/20 (US);
F01P5/12 (EP,US);
F04D13/0606 (EP);
F04D29/426 (EP);
F04D29/5806 (EP);
H02K7/14 (EP);
F01P2003/006 (US);
F01P2005/125 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PUMPENGRUPPE | [2021/32] | English: | PUMP GROUP | [2021/32] | French: | GROUPE DE POMPES | [2021/32] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/32] | 18.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 14.12.2022 | AT | 14.12.2022 | CZ | 14.12.2022 | DK | 14.12.2022 | EE | 14.12.2022 | ES | 14.12.2022 | FI | 14.12.2022 | HR | 14.12.2022 | LT | 14.12.2022 | LV | 14.12.2022 | MC | 14.12.2022 | NL | 14.12.2022 | PL | 14.12.2022 | RO | 14.12.2022 | RS | 14.12.2022 | SE | 14.12.2022 | SI | 14.12.2022 | SK | 14.12.2022 | SM | 14.12.2022 | NO | 14.03.2023 | GR | 15.03.2023 | IS | 14.04.2023 | PT | 14.04.2023 | GB | 14.06.2023 | IE | 14.06.2023 | LU | 14.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | FR | 30.06.2023 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/21] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
IE | 14.06.2023 | ||
LU | 14.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
LU | 14.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 14.12.2022 | |
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 14.12.2022 | |
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 14.12.2022 | |
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 14.12.2022 | |
NO | 14.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB165046 (KALMAN KANDO) [A] 1,13 * page 1, lines 32-44 ** page 1, line 82 - page 2, line 11; figure . *; | [A]EP1100177 (ATLAS COPCO AIRPOWER NV [BE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0021] , [0023] , [0024] , [0035] , [0036]; figure 1 *; | [XY]EP2523314 (HAMILTON SUNDSTRAND CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4-8,13-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] , [0006] , [0009] , [0010] , [0014] - [0016]; figures 1,2,5 * [Y] 12; | [Y]US2015034027 (BUCHHOLZ THOMAS [DE], et al) [Y] 12 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0014] , [0016]; figure 8 *; | [A]US2016290364 (LEE BONG SANG [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0020] , [0023] , [0025] , [0043]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2017154837 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD [JP]) [A] 8 * figure 1 *; | [I]WO2017192336 (BORGWARNER INC [US]) [I] 1,2,4-6,13-15 * paragraphs [0024] , [0025] , [0026] , [0027]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2017220119 (PIERBURG PUMP TECHNOLOGY GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * page 4, line 29 - page 6, line 23; figure 1 *; | EP3429070 [ ] (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD [JP]) [ ] * paragraphs [0021] , [0050] , [0059] , [0060]; figure 1 * |