EP3737717 - POLYMERIC BLEND COMPOSITE AND A PROCESS FOR PREPARING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gharda Chemicals Limited B-27/29 MIDC Dombivili (East) Thane, Maharashtra 421203 / IN | [2020/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAPADIA, Aditi S c/o, B-27/29, M.I.D.C. Dombivali - East Thane, Maharashtra 421203 / IN | 02 /
TRIVEDI, Prakash D Gharda House, 48 Hill Road, Bandra (West) Mumbai, Maharashtra 400 050 / IN | 03 /
PATIL, Amol T c/o, B-27/29, M.I.D.C. Dombivali - East Thane, Maharashtra 421203 / IN | 04 /
BHATTACHARYYA, Arup R c/o, B-27/29, M.I.D.C. Dombivali - East Thane, Maharashtra 421203 / IN | [2020/47] | Representative(s) | Linage González, Rafael Jacobacci & Partners, S.L. Génova, 15 - 1° 28004 Madrid / ES | [2020/47] | Application number, filing date | 19738005.8 | 11.01.2019 | [2020/47] | WO2019IB50210 | Priority number, date | IN201821001494 | 12.01.2018 Original published format: IN201821001494 | [2020/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019138361 | Date: | 18.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3737717 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IN | 18.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08L71/00, C08G73/18, C01B32/158, B82Y30/00, C01B32/168, C08L71/02 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
C08G73/18 (EP);
C09K5/14 (US);
B29B9/06 (US);
C01B32/168 (EP);
C01B32/174 (US);
C08J3/203 (US);
C08L71/00 (US);
C08L71/02 (EP);
B29K2071/00 (US);
B29K2105/162 (US);
B29K2507/04 (US);
B29K2995/0005 (US);
B82Y30/00 (EP);
C01B2202/06 (EP,US);
C01B2202/24 (US);
C01B2202/34 (EP,US);
C01B2202/36 (EP,US);
C01P2002/74 (US);
C08L2201/08 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L71/02, C08L79/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/47] | C08L71/00, C08G73/18, C01B32/158, B82Y30/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/47] | Title | German: | POLYMERMISCHUNGSVERBUNDSTOFF UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2020/47] | English: | POLYMERIC BLEND COMPOSITE AND A PROCESS FOR PREPARING THE SAME | [2020/47] | French: | COMPOSITE DE MÉLANGE POLYMÈRE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR SA PRÉPARATION | [2020/47] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 10.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/47] | 02.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2013164854 (GHARDA KEKI HORMUSJI [IN]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * claims 1-4, 7, 8, 10 *; | [Y]US2015183993 (GHARDA KEKI HORMUSJI [IN], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * examples 6-8 *; | [Y] - YAN YAN HUANG ET AL, "Dispersion of Carbon Nanotubes: Mixing, Sonication, Stabilization, and Composite Properties", POLYMERS, (20120123), vol. 4, no. 1, doi:10.3390/polym4010275, pages 275 - 295, XP055625011 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/polym4010275 | [T] - KULTHE M G ET AL, "Electrical, mechanical, and electromagnetic interference shielding properties of poly(ether-ketone)-MWCNT nanocomposites", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE: MATERIALS IN ELECTRONICS, (20200909), vol. 31, no. 20, doi:10.1007/S10854-020-04359-7, ISSN 0957-4522, pages 18085 - 18095, XP037300618 [T] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10854-020-04359-7 | [Y] - Ji-Ye Kang, Soo-Mi Eo, In-Yup Jeon, Yeong Suk Choi, Loon-Seng Tan, Jong-Beom Baek, "Multifunctional Poly(2,5-benzimidazole)/Carbon Nanotube Composite Films", vol. 48, (20100101), pages 1067 - 1078, URL: https://apps.dtic.mil/sti/pdfs/ADA573690.pdf, XP002804193 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pola.23862 | International search | [YA]US2011311811 (COLLETTE CHRISTIAN [FR], et al) [Y] 1-2, 4-5, 7, 12- 14, 16 * (abstract; paragraphs [0013], [0017], [0023], [0024], [0035], [0037]; claims 1, 3-6) (abstract; paragraphs [0013], [0017], [0023], [0024], [0035], [0037]; claims 1, 3-6) * [A] 3, 6, 8- 11, 15, 17; | [YA]WO2013164854 (GHARDA KEKI HORMUSJI [IN]) [Y] 1-2, 4-5, 7, 12- 14, 16 * (abstract; claims 1-4, 8, 10) (abstract; claims 1-4, 8, 10) * [A] 3, 6, 8- 11, 15, 17; | [YA] - HUANG, YAN YAN et al., "Dispersion of Carbon Nanotubes: Mixing, Sonication, Stabilization, and Composite Properties", POLYMERS, (20120123), vol. 4, no. 1, ISSN 2073-4360, pages 275 - 295, XP055625011 [Y] 1-2, 4-5, 7, 12- 14, 16 * (abstract; section 2 and 3; table 2) * [A] 3, 6, 8- 11, 15, 17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/polym4010275 | by applicant | WO2013164854 | US2015183993 |