EP3737424 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR FACILITATING DELIVERY OF SYNTHETIC NUCLEIC ACIDS TO CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Translate Bio MA, Inc. 29 Hartwell Avenue Lexington, MA 02421 / US | [2020/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHAT, Balkrishen 911 Rosemary Avenue Carlsbad, CA 92011 / US | 02 /
TAY, Jia 11 Marian Road Acton, MA 01720 / US | 03 /
KARMAKAR, Saswata 606 South Street, Apt. 4B Waltham, MA 02453 / US | 04 /
CHAU, Nelson 114 Edwardel Road Needham, MA 02492 / US | [2020/47] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/47] | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19738098.3 | 10.01.2019 | [2020/47] | WO2019US13070 | Priority number, date | US201862615577P | 10.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862615577 P | [2020/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019140102 | Date: | 18.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3737424 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/54, A61K47/61, A61K48/00, A61K38/45, A61P25/00, A61P37/00 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
A61K47/549 (EP,US);
A61K38/45 (US);
A61K31/7088 (EP);
A61K31/7105 (EP);
A61K31/712 (EP);
A61K31/7125 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
C12N15/87 (EP);
C12N9/1018 (EP);
C12Y201/03003 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/7088, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/7105, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/7125, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/712, A61K2300/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2020/47] | A61K48/00, A61K47/54, A61K47/61, A61K38/45, A61P25/00, A61P37/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/47] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERLEICHTERUNG DER ABGABE VON SYNTHETISCHEN NUKLEINSÄUREN AN ZELLEN | [2020/47] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR FACILITATING DELIVERY OF SYNTHETIC NUCLEIC ACIDS TO CELLS | [2020/47] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET MÉTHODES POUR FACILITER L'ADMINISTRATION D'ACIDES NUCLÉIQUES SYNTHÉTIQUES DANS DES CELLULES | [2020/47] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 20.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/47] | 17.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 27.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 27.07.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 27.07.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.08.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2014179620 (ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * claim 1 *; | [XYI]WO2016130943 (RANA THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [X] 1-5,12,13 * page 47, paragraphs 1-2 * [Y] 1-15 [I] 1-15; | [X]WO2016205410 (MPEG LA LLC [US]) [X] 1-6,12,13 * paragraph [0089] *; | [X]WO2017075038 (RANA THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [X] 1-6,12,13 * page 26, lines 21-27; claim 1 *; | [Y] - YUANYU HUANG, "Preclinical and Clinical Advances of GalNAc-Decorated Nucleic Acid Therapeutics", MOLECULAR THERAPY-NUCLEIC ACIDS, US, (20170301), vol. 6, doi:10.1016/j.omtn.2016.12.003, ISSN 2162-2531, pages 116 - 132, XP055485332 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.omtn.2016.12.003 | International search | [A]US2012071540 (LU PATRICK Y [US], et al) [A] 1-10, 71-73* See the whole document. *; | [A]US2012136042 (MANOHARAN MUTHIAH [US], et al) [A] 1-10, 71-73 * See the whole document. *; | [A]US2015299695 (UHLMANN EUGEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-10, 71-73 * See paragraphs [0039], [0149]-0150]; claims 1, 30, 68; figures 1A-1D. *; | [X]WO2017075038 (RANA THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [X] 1-10, 71-73 * See page 26, lines 21-28, page 35, lines 1-11, page 59, lines 18-30; claims 1-2, 69-72. *; | [A] - HUANG, Y., "Preclinical and Clinical Advances of GalNAc-Decorated Nucleic Acid Therapeutics", Molecular Therapy: Nucleic Acids, (20170300), vol. 6, doi:doi:10.1016/j.omtn.2016.12.003, pages 116 - 132, XP055485332 [A] 1-10, 71-73 * See the whole document. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.omtn.2016.12.003 |