EP3737765 - ENHANCED IMMUNE CELLS USING DUAL SHRNA AND COMPOSITION INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.11.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2024 | New entry: Legal effect of interlocutory decision | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Curocell Inc. 11, Gukjegwahak 16-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon, 34002 / KR | For all designated states Korea Advanced Institute of Science and Technology 291 Daehak-ro Guseong-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34141 / KR | [2024/27] |
Former [2020/47] | For all designated states Curocell Inc. 3rd floor, KHE Building 48 Yuseong-daero 1184 beon-gil Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34050 / KR | ||
For all designated states Korea Advanced Institute of Science and Technology 291 Daehak-ro Guseong-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34141 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Chan Hyuk 291 Daehak-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34141 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Young-Ho Unit 2003, Building 208, 523 Doan Dong-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34189 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Yujean Unit 602, Building 101, Noeun Hanwha Dream & Green Apts. 33 Jijok Buk-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34070 / KR | 04 /
LEE, HyeongJi Unit 1216, Riviera i-Nuri 5, 445-4 Bongmyeong- dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34168 / KR | 05 /
LEE, Sang Hoon Unit 302, 210-83 Shinseong-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34116 / KR | [2020/47] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/47] | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19738866.3 | 10.01.2019 | [2020/47] | WO2019IB50194 | Priority number, date | KR20180004238 | 12.01.2018 Original published format: KR 20180004238 | [2020/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019138354 | Date: | 18.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3737765 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3737765 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/63, C07K14/725, C07K16/30, C12N5/0783, C12N15/113, A61K35/17, C12N15/10 | [2021/19] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP,KR);
C12N15/63 (KR);
A61K2239/31 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2239/48 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/7088 (US);
A61K38/177 (EP,US);
A61K38/1774 (US);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/4631 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/4636 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/464412 (EP,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C07K14/4702 (US);
C07K14/7051 (EP,KR,US);
C07K14/70521 (US);
C07K14/70578 (US);
C07K16/2803 (EP,US);
C07K16/2809 (EP);
C07K16/2818 (EP);
C07K16/30 (KR);
C12N15/1075 (EP);
C12N15/1138 (EP,US);
C12N5/0636 (EP,KR,US);
C12N5/0637 (EP,KR,US);
C12N5/0646 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (US);
C07K2317/31 (EP);
C07K2317/53 (US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/70 (EP);
C07K2317/73 (EP);
C07K2319/00 (EP);
C07K2319/02 (US);
C07K2319/03 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2319/30 (US);
C07K2319/33 (EP,US);
C07K2319/715 (US);
C12N2310/122 (US);
C12N2310/14 (EP,US);
C12N2310/531 (US);
C12N2320/31 (EP,US);
C12N2320/32 (US);
C12N2330/51 (EP);
C12N2510/00 (KR,US);
C12Q2525/301 (KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12N15/1075, C12Q2525/207 (EP);
C12N2310/531, C12N2310/14 (EP) |
Former IPC [2020/47] | C12N15/63, C07K14/725, C07K16/30, C12N5/0783, C12N15/113, A61K35/17 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE IMMUNZELLEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON DUALER SHRNA UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNG DAMIT | [2020/47] | English: | ENHANCED IMMUNE CELLS USING DUAL SHRNA AND COMPOSITION INCLUDING THE SAME | [2020/47] | French: | CELLULES IMMUNES AMPLIFIÉES UTILISANT UN RNASH DOUBLE, ET COMPOSITIONS LES COMPRENANT | [2020/47] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 10.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/47] | 08.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21207719.2 / EP4006153 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.09.2022
22.09.2022
ADMISSIBLE ELKINGTON AND FIFE LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB Opponent's representative Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.09.2022
22.09.2022
ADMISSIBLE ELKINGTON AND FIFE LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB Opponent's representative Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | 05.10.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.02.2023 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.02.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.04.2024 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.04.2024 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 31.07.2024 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | Appeal following opposition | 04.06.2024 | Appeal received No. T0820/24 | 04.06.2024 | Payment of appeal fee | 31.07.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.01.2019 | AL | 22.12.2021 | AT | 22.12.2021 | CY | 22.12.2021 | CZ | 22.12.2021 | EE | 22.12.2021 | HR | 22.12.2021 | LT | 22.12.2021 | LV | 22.12.2021 | MK | 22.12.2021 | RO | 22.12.2021 | RS | 22.12.2021 | SI | 22.12.2021 | SK | 22.12.2021 | SM | 22.12.2021 | IE | 10.01.2022 | BG | 22.03.2022 | GR | 23.03.2022 | IS | 22.04.2022 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CY | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MK | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
IE | 10.01.2022 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CY | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
IE | 10.01.2022 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
IE | 10.01.2022 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
IE | 10.01.2022 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 22.12.2021 | |
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | HR | 22.12.2021 | |
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | HR | 22.12.2021 | |
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | LT | 22.12.2021 | |
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 22.12.2021 | |
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 22.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2016126608 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [A]WO2017040945 (MEMORIAL SLOAN KETTERING CANCER CENTER [US]); | International search | [A]US2014219975 (JUNE CARL H [US], et al); | [A]US2014227237 (JUNE CARL H [US], et al); | [X]WO2015142675 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [X]US2016311917 (BEATTY GREGORY [US], et al); | [PX]WO2018012895 (CUROCELL INC [KR]) | by applicant | US4690915 | US5858358 | US5883223 | US6352694 | US6534055 | US6692964 | US6797514 | US6867041 | US6887466 | US6905680 | US6905681 | US6905874 | US2006121005 | US7067318 | US7144575 | US7172869 | US7175843 | US7232566 | WO2016069282 | Opposition | US2008293142 | WO2015142675 | WO2016126608 | US2016311917 | WO2017040945 | WO2018049471 |