EP3717970 - PARTICLE COLLECTION SYSTEM WITH DISCHARGING ELECTRODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring TX 77389 / US | [2020/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ONO, Manabu 3-4-39 Tsurumichuuou Yokohama, Tsurumi-ku 230-0051 / JP | 02 /
NAKAZAWA, Takashi 3-4-39 Tsurumichuuou Yokohama, Tsurumi-ku 230-0051 / JP | 03 /
KAWAMURA, Takeshi 3-4-39 Tsurumichuuou Yokohama, Tsurumi-ku 230-0051 / JP | 04 /
NAKAJIMA, Kensuke 3-4-39 Tsurumichuuou Yokohama, Tsurumi-ku 230-0051 / JP | 05 /
HORI, Satoru 3-4-39 Tsurumichuuou Yokohama, Tsurumi-ku 230-0051 / JP | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/41] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 19738867.1 | 10.01.2019 | [2020/41] | WO2019US13019 | Priority number, date | JP20180001765 | 10.01.2018 Original published format: JP 2018001765 | [2020/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019140069 | Date: | 18.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3717970 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 18.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G03G21/00, B41J29/377, G03G21/20 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
B41J29/377 (EP);
G03G21/206 (EP,US);
G03G15/2039 (US);
G03G21/1832 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/41] | G03G21/00, B41J29/377 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] | Title | German: | PARTIKELSAMMELSYSTEM MIT ENTLADUNGSELEKTRODE | [2020/41] | English: | PARTICLE COLLECTION SYSTEM WITH DISCHARGING ELECTRODE | [2020/41] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COLLECTE DE PARTICULES DOTÉ D'UNE ÉLECTRODE DE DÉCHARGE | [2020/41] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/41] | 29.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/40] | 16.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2010029740 (MIDORI ANZEN CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0024] , [ 0027] , [ 0028] , [ 0030] , [ 0032] , [ 0037]; figures 1-11 *; | [A]US2012045243 (NISHIKAWA SATORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2012141173 (IWASAKI ATSUSHI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2013190651 (KONICA MINOLTA INC) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]CN102314143B (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2017242397 (KUDO MASAFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]JP6188650B (KYOCERA DOCUMENT SOLUTIONS INC) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2012045243 (NISHIKAWA SATORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-15; | [A]JP2013190651 (KONICA MINOLTA INC)[A] 1-15; | [A]CN102314143B (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1-15; | [A]JP6188650B (KYOCERA DOCUMENT SOLUTIONS, INC) [A] 1-15 | by applicant | JP2010029740 |