EP3824529 - ELECTRIC MOTOR COMPRISING A WIRING UNIT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ELECTRIC MOTOR WITH COMPRISING A WIRING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEW-EURODRIVE GmbH & Co. KG Ernst-Blickle-Str. 42 76646 Bruchsal / DE | [2021/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEER, Markus Harzfeldstr. 10a 79689 Maulburg / DE | 02 /
HETTEL, Domenik Fronäcker 12 76474 Au am Rhein / DE | [2021/21] | Application number, filing date | 19739198.0 | 04.07.2019 | [2021/21] | WO2019EP25214 | Priority number, date | DE20181005672 | 19.07.2018 Original published format: DE102018005672 | [2021/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020015856 | Date: | 23.01.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3824529 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02K3/52 | [2021/21] | CPC: |
H02K3/522 (EP,US);
H02K15/0062 (US);
H02K21/16 (US);
H02K2203/09 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] | Title | German: | ELEKTROMOTOR MIT EINER VERSCHALTUNGSEINHEIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ELEKTROMOTORS MIT EINER VERSCHALTUNGSEINHEIT | [2021/21] | English: | ELECTRIC MOTOR COMPRISING A WIRING UNIT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ELECTRIC MOTOR WITH COMPRISING A WIRING UNIT | [2021/21] | French: | MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE COMPRENANT UNE UNITÉ DE CÂBLAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉALISATION D'UN MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE COMPRENANT UNE UNITÉ DE CÂBLAGE | [2021/21] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 19.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDY]DE10328720 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [XD] 1,4-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraphs [0020] , [ 0022] * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 2,3; | [Y]WO2017162568 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 2 * page 2, line 27 - page 3, line 6 * * page 4, line 21 - line 23 * * figures 1, 2 *; | [Y]US2016036187 (HOUZUMI NOBUJI [JP], et al) [Y] 3 * figures 3, 11, 12 * | by applicant | DE112013005061T | DE102012024581 | DE102012020329 | DE10328720 | DE102014201637 | EP2752973 | DE102016204935 | DE102015200093 |