EP3837232 - A METHOD FOR PRODUCING METHANOL IN A REACTOR WITH BYPASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Topsoe A/S Haldor Topsøes Allé 1 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [2022/33] |
Former [2021/25] | For all designated states Haldor Topsøe A/S Haldor Topsøes Allé 1 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TJÄRNEHOV, Emil Andreas Skepparkroksgatan 1 216 22 Limhamn / SE | 02 /
DAHL, Per Juul Krumningen 16 2950 Vedbæk / DK | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | Topsoe A/S Haldor Topsøes Allé 1 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2021/25] | Haldor Topsøe A/S Haldor Topsøes Allé 1 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | Application number, filing date | 19739585.8 | 11.07.2019 | [2021/25] | WO2019EP68678 | Priority number, date | DK2018PA00475 | 17.08.2018 Original published format: DK PA201800475 | [2021/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020035231 | Date: | 20.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3837232 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07C29/151, C07C31/04 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
C07C29/151 (EP);
C07C29/152 (EP,KR,US);
C07C29/1518 (US);
C07C31/04 (KR);
Y02P20/52 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/151, C07C31/04 (EP);
C07C29/152, C07C31/04 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON METHANOL IN EINEM REAKTOR MIT BYPASS | [2021/25] | English: | A METHOD FOR PRODUCING METHANOL IN A REACTOR WITH BYPASS | [2021/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE MÉTHANOL DANS UN RÉACTEUR PRÉSENTANT UNE DÉRIVATION | [2021/25] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 08.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2006018610 (DAVY PROCESS TECHN LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1 * page 5, line 13 - page 6, line 12; claims 1,13 * [I] 1-3; | [XP]WO2019008317 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB]) [XP] 1* page 10, line 25 - page 11, line 21; figure 1; claim 10 * | by applicant | US2011065966 | US8536235 | WO2017186538 | CN107382665 |