EP3824448 - MODULAR AUTOMATED TRANSACTION MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.08.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diebold Nixdorf Incorporated 5995 Mayfair Road North Canton, Ohio 44720 / US | [2021/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BESKITT, William Daniel 4817 Meadowlane Drive NW Canton, Ohio 44709 / US | 02 /
HARTY, Michael J. 5450 Island Drive Canton, Ohio 44718 / US | [2021/21] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2021/21] | Application number, filing date | 19739792.0 | 19.06.2019 | [2021/21] | WO2019US37854 | Priority number, date | US201862701178P | 20.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862701178 P | [2021/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020018225 | Date: | 23.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3824448 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G07D11/40 | [2021/21] | CPC: |
G07D11/40 (EP,US);
G07D11/13 (US);
G07D11/14 (US);
G07D11/18 (US);
G07D11/237 (US);
G07D11/32 (US);
G07F19/202 (US);
G07F19/203 (US);
G07F19/205 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] | Title | German: | MODULARE AUTOMATISIERTE TRANSAKTIONSMASCHINE | [2021/21] | English: | MODULAR AUTOMATED TRANSACTION MACHINE | [2021/21] | French: | GUICHET AUTOMATIQUE DE BANQUE MODULAIRE | [2021/21] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 20.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US7240829 (GRAEF H THOMAS [US], et al) [X] 1,14 * abstract * * column 9, lines 24-26,56 * * column 10, line 8 - lines 10,12 * * column 12, lines 5-8,40-52 * * column 12, line 60 - column 13, line 6 * * column 13, lines 14-23, 42-43 * * column 14, paragraphs 45-47,57-59 * * column 17, lines 48-49, 53-57 * * column 15, lines 57-59 * * column 20, lines 20-22 * * column 16, line 66 - column 17, line 2 * * column 23, lines 20-40 * [Y] 6 [I] 2-5,7-23; | [A]WO2008111152 (GLORY KOGYO KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-23* the whole document *; | [Y]US2017116811 (YOKOTE TAKAMOTO [JP]) [Y] 6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0034] , [0036] , [0037] , [0038] , [0040] - [0042] - [0053] , [0058] * |