EP3823931 - HEMATITE PIGMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LANXESS Deutschland GmbH Kennedyplatz 1 50569 Köln / DE | [2021/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSENHAHN, Carsten Lärchenweg 10 47906 Kempen / DE | 02 /
MÜLLER, Rolf Heinrich-Heine-Str.13 47829 Krefeld / DE | 03 /
SCHAUFLER, Larissa Spieckermannstr. 2b 45149 Essen / DE | 04 /
KATHREIN, Christine Stadtparkinsel 10 41515 Grevenbroich / DE | 05 /
WEBER-CZAPLIK, Anna Tersteegenstr. 77 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | 06 /
KLUPP-TAYLOR, Robin Schwalbweiher 12a 91301 Forchheim / DE | 07 /
GOLKAR, Saeedeh Südweg 8 91077 Neukirchen am Brand / DE | [2021/21] | Application number, filing date | 19740366.0 | 15.07.2019 | [2021/21] | WO2019EP68946 | Priority number, date | EP20180184286 | 18.07.2018 Original published format: EP 18184286 | [2021/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020016147 | Date: | 23.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3823931 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3823931 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C01G49/06, C09C1/24 | [2021/21] | CPC: |
C09C1/24 (EP);
C01G49/06 (EP);
C01P2004/54 (EP);
C01P2004/64 (EP);
C01P2006/60 (EP);
C01P2006/62 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HÄMATITPIGMENTE | [2021/21] | English: | HEMATITE PIGMENTS | [2021/21] | French: | PIGMENTS D'HÉMATITE | [2021/21] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 18.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.07.2019 | AL | 16.03.2022 | CY | 16.03.2022 | DK | 16.03.2022 | EE | 16.03.2022 | FI | 16.03.2022 | HR | 16.03.2022 | LT | 16.03.2022 | LV | 16.03.2022 | MC | 16.03.2022 | MK | 16.03.2022 | MT | 16.03.2022 | PL | 16.03.2022 | RO | 16.03.2022 | RS | 16.03.2022 | SE | 16.03.2022 | SK | 16.03.2022 | SM | 16.03.2022 | BG | 16.06.2022 | NO | 16.06.2022 | GR | 17.06.2022 | IE | 15.07.2022 | LU | 15.07.2022 | IS | 16.07.2022 | PT | 18.07.2022 | CH | 31.07.2022 | LI | 31.07.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/25] | HU | 15.07.2019 | |
AL | 16.03.2022 | ||
CY | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
MK | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IE | 15.07.2022 | ||
LU | 15.07.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
CY | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
MK | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IE | 15.07.2022 | ||
LU | 15.07.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
CY | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IE | 15.07.2022 | ||
LU | 15.07.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IE | 15.07.2022 | ||
LU | 15.07.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
LU | 15.07.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | EE | 16.03.2022 | |
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | EE | 16.03.2022 | |
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | EE | 16.03.2022 | |
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | EE | 16.03.2022 | |
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 16.03.2022 | |
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 16.03.2022 | |
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 16.03.2022 | |
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 16.03.2022 | |
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 16.03.2022 | |
NO | 16.06.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0911369 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0018] - [0033]; examples 1-7 *; | [A]EP0997500 (TODA KOGYO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-14 * example 1; claims 1-13; table 3 *; | [A]US2005274284 (ROSENHAHN CARSTEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * examples 2-4; table 1 *; | [A]US2006196392 (MEISEN ULRICH [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0020] - [0052]; examples 1-3 *; | [AD]WO2009100767 (ROCKWOOD ITALIA SPA [IT], et al) [AD] 1-14 * page 4, line 6 - page 9, line 15; examples 1-2 *; | [AD]US2017253745 (CZAPLIK WALDEMAR [DE], et al) [AD] 1-14 * paragraphs [0020] - [0113]; example 1; tables 2-3 *; | [A] - TATI NURHAYATI ET AL, "Syntheses of Hematite ([alpha]-Fe2O3) Nanoparticles Using Microwave-Assisted Calcination Method", MATERIALS SCIENCE FORUM, (20130101), vol. 737, doi:10.4028/www.scientific.net/MSF.737.197, pages 197 - 203, XP055537910 [A] 1-14 * "Experimental section";; figures 2-3,5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4028/www.scientific.net/MSF.737.197 | [A] - OPUCHOVIC OLGA ET AL, "Historical hematite pigment: Synthesis by an aqueous sol-gel method, characterization and application for the colouration of ceramic gl", CERAMICS INTERNATIONAL, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20141209), vol. 41, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.CERAMINT.2014.11.145, ISSN 0272-8842, pages 4504 - 4513, XP029223518 [A] 1-14 * "Sample preparation", "Results and discussion";; table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ceramint.2014.11.145 | by applicant | EP1106577 | US6503315 | WO2009100767 | US2014134216 | US2017253745 | - Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, VCH Weinheim, (20060000), pages 61 - 67 | - SHEN, QINGSUN, FENGZHI, Wujiyan Gongye, (19970000), vol. 6, pages 5 - 8 | - R. P. GOEHNER, Anal. Chem., (19780000), vol. 50, page 1223 |