EP3741004 - BROAD TUNABLE BANDWIDTH RADIAL LINE SLOT ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kymeta Corporation 12277 134th Court NE Suite 100 Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | [2020/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAZEGAR, Mohsen 12277 134th Court NE, Suite 100 Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 02 /
NASSAR, Ibrahim 12277 134th Court NE, Suite 100 Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | [2020/48] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2020/48] | Application number, filing date | 19740944.4 | 16.01.2019 | [2020/48] | WO2019US13854 | Priority number, date | US201862618493P | 17.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862618493 P | US201916247398 | 14.01.2019 Original published format: US201916247398 | [2020/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019143727 | Date: | 25.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3741004 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q3/24, H01Q1/52, H01Q3/44, H01Q5/42, H01Q21/29, H01Q1/28, H01Q15/00, H01Q21/06, H01Q25/00, H01Q21/28, // H01Q21/24 | [2021/41] | CPC: |
H01Q15/0086 (EP,US);
H01Q3/24 (KR);
H01Q5/40 (US);
H01Q1/288 (EP,US);
H01Q1/523 (EP,US);
H01Q21/0031 (US);
H01Q21/064 (EP,US);
H01Q21/20 (US);
H01Q21/28 (EP,US);
H01Q21/29 (EP,US);
H01Q25/00 (EP,US);
H01Q3/40 (US);
H01Q3/44 (EP);
H01Q5/22 (KR);
H01Q5/42 (EP);
H01Q21/24 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/48] | H01Q3/24, H01Q5/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/48] | Title | German: | RADIALE LEITUNGSSCHLITZANTENNE MIT BREITER ABSTIMMBARER BANDBREITE | [2020/48] | English: | BROAD TUNABLE BANDWIDTH RADIAL LINE SLOT ANTENNA | [2020/48] | French: | ANTENNE À FENTE À LIGNES RADIALES À LARGE BANDE ACCORDABLE | [2020/48] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 31.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/48] | 30.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/51] | 16.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2016261042 (SAZEGAR MOHSEN [US], et al); | [XI]WO2016187701 (COMMUNICATION COMPONENTS ANTENNA INC [CA]); | [XI]US2017294715 (WU LIGANG [CN], et al) | International search | [A]US2005110683 (SONG PETER C [HK], et al); | [Y]US2011074630 (SNOW JEFFREY M [US]); | [Y]US2014009357 (TIEZZI FERDINANDO [CH], et al); | [XY]US2016233588 (BILY ADAM [US], et al); | [A]US2017195018 (MA ZHENGXIANG [US], et al) | by applicant | US2016261042 | WO2016187701 | US2017294715 | US9893435 |