EP3740133 - ULTRASOUND IMAGING APPARATUS AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.08.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Medison Co., Ltd. 3366, Hanseo-ro, Nam-myeon Hongcheon-gun, Gangwon-do, 25108 / KR | [2020/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KO, Jong-Sun 3366, Hanseo-ro, Nam-myeon Hongcheon-gun Gangwon-do 25108 / KR | 02 /
MIN, Hae Kee 3366, Hanseo-ro, Nam-myeon Hongcheon-gun Gangwon-do 25108 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Seong Jin 3366, Hanseo-ro, Nam-myeon Hongcheon-gun Gangwon-do 25108 / KR | [2020/48] | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2020/48] | Application number, filing date | 19741327.1 | 16.01.2019 | [2020/48] | WO2019KR00641 | Priority number, date | KR20180006346 | 18.01.2018 Original published format: KR 20180006346 | [2020/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019143123 | Date: | 25.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3740133 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/08, A61B8/00 | [2020/48] | CPC: |
A61B8/0841 (EP,KR,US);
A61B17/3403 (EP,US);
A61B34/20 (US);
A61B8/0883 (EP);
A61B8/14 (US);
A61B8/4455 (EP,US);
A61B8/461 (KR);
A61B8/463 (EP,US);
A61B8/5223 (EP);
A61B8/54 (KR);
G16H50/30 (EP);
A61B10/0233 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3413 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2063 (US);
A61B2034/2065 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/48] | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLBILDGEBUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DAVON | [2020/48] | English: | ULTRASOUND IMAGING APPARATUS AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING THE SAME | [2020/48] | French: | APPAREIL D'IMAGERIE ULTRASONORE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2020/48] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 25.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/48] | 09.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013096430 (YOSHIARA HIROKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [YA]US2017095226 (TANAKA GO [JP], et al) [Y] 4-6,15 * the whole document * [A] 1-3,7-14; | [XYI]US2017143295 (PARK SUNG-CHAN [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,7,9,12-14 * the whole document * [Y] 4-6,15 [I] 8,10,11 | International search | [A]JP2010068923 (FUJIFILM CORP) [A] 1-15* See the whole document. *; | [Y]US2015209003 (HALMANN MENACHEM [US], et al) [Y] 8-10 * See paragraphs [12],[19], claim 1 and figues 1-5. *; | [A]US2015289839 (SAITO MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * See the whole document. *; | [XY]US2016081666 (DEGUCHI TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7, 11-15 * See paragraph [18] and claims 15-24. * [Y] 8-10; | [A]US2016184611 (BROSENS-KESSELS ANGELIQUE CARIN JOHANNA MARIA [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * See the whole document. * |