Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
29.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.12.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
11.08.2023 | First examination report | |
10.08.2023 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
31.01.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.01.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
11.08.2021 | Supplementary search report | published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
06.08.2021 | Change - classification | published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
06.08.2021 | Change - classification | published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
19.03.2021 | Change: Validation states | published on 21.04.2021 [2021/16] |
19.03.2021 | Change - extension states | published on 21.04.2021 [2021/16] |
29.01.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.10.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
23.10.2020 | Request for examination filed | published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
28.09.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.07.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.06.2020 | Change - representative | |
26.06.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.07.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.07.2019 | New entry: applicant or inventor |