EP3743909 - ELECTRO-OPTIC DISPLAYS, AND METHODS FOR DRIVING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E Ink Corporation IP Department 1000 Technology Park Drive Billerica, Massachusetts 01821-4165 / US | [2020/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIM, Teck Ping c/o E Ink Corporation, 1000 Technology Park Drive Billerica, Massachusetts 01821-4165 / US | 02 /
BEN-DOV, Yuval c/o E Ink Corporation, 1000 Technology Park Drive Billerica, Massachusetts 01821-4165 / US | 03 /
AU, Joanna F. c/o E Ink Corporation, 1000 Technology Park Drive Billerica, Massachusetts 01821-4165 / US | 04 /
CROUNSE, Kenneth R. c/o E Ink Corporation, 1000 Technology Park Drive Billerica, Massachusetts 01821-4165 / US | [2020/49] | Representative(s) | Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road Holborn London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/49] | Cole, David John 46 Kirkhill Gardens West Greenlees Estate Cambuslang Glasgow G72 8EZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19741516.9 | 22.01.2019 | [2020/49] | WO2019US14485 | Priority number, date | US201862620129P | 22.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862620129 P | US201816128996 | 12.09.2018 Original published format: US201816128996 | [2020/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019144097 | Date: | 25.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3743909 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/34, G02F1/1685 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
G09G3/344 (EP,RU);
G09G3/34 (KR);
G02F1/1685 (KR);
G09G2300/0814 (KR);
G09G2320/0209 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/49] | Title | German: | ELEKTROOPTISCHE ANZEIGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANSTEUERUNG DAVON | [2020/49] | English: | ELECTRO-OPTIC DISPLAYS, AND METHODS FOR DRIVING SAME | [2020/49] | French: | DISPOSITIFS D'AFFICHAGE ÉLECTRO-OPTIQUES ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'EXCITATION | [2020/49] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 24.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/49] | 14.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011141156 (MIYASAKA EIJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-8 * paragraphs [0054] - [0059] - [0093] - [0095] - [0117] - [0122]; figures 1,5,6A,7A,8 *[I] 5; | [XI]US2017148372 (EMELIE PIERRE-YVES [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8 * paragraphs [0065] - [0068] - [0070] - [0078]; figures 1,3A,3B,4 * [I] 5 | International search | [Y]US2013194250 (AMUNDSON KARL R [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * See paragraphs [0109]-[0119], [0137]-[0147]; claim 1; and figures 9-11B. *; | [A]US2016133196 (EMELIE PIERRE-YVES [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * See paragraphs [0121]-[0127]; and figures 4-8. *; | [Y]US2016225322 (SIM TECK PING [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * See abstract; paragraphs [0097]-[0100]; and figures 8A-8B. *; | [A]US2016225321 (SIM TECK PING [US], et al) [A] 1-8* See paragraphs [0065]-[0070]; and figures 1-2. *; | [A]US2016314766 (HARRINGTON DEMETRIOUS MARK [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * See paragraphs [0054]-[0055], [0063]-[0067]; and figures 4, 7A-8G. * | by applicant | US4418346 | US5760761 | US5777782 | US5808783 | US5872552 | US5930026 | US6054071 | US6055091 | US6097531 | US6128124 | US6130774 | US6137467 | US6144361 | US6147791 | US6172798 | US6184856 | US6225971 | US6241921 | US6271823 | US6301038 | WO0201281 | US2002075556 | US6445489 | US2002131147 | US6504524 | US6512354 | US6531997 | US2003102858 | US6753999 | US6825970 | US2004246562 | US6870657 | US2005062714 | US6900851 | US6922276 | US6950220 | US2005253777 | US6982178 | US6995550 | US7002728 | US7012600 | US7023420 | US7034783 | US7061166 | US7061662 | US7072095 | US7075502 | US7116318 | US7116466 | US7119772 | US7144942 | US7170670 | US7177066 | US7193625 | US2007070032 | US2007076289 | US7202847 | US2007091418 | US2007103427 | US7236291 | US7242514 | US2007176912 | US7259744 | US7304787 | US7312784 | US7312794 | US2007296452 | US7321459 | US2008024429 | US2008024482 | US7327511 | US2008136774 | US2008169821 | US7408699 | US7411719 | US7420549 | US2008218471 | US7453445 | US2008291129 | US2008303780 | US7492339 | US7528822 | US7535624 | US7545358 | US2009174651 | US2009195568 | US7583251 | US7602374 | US7612760 | US2009322721 | US7679814 | US7679599 | US7679813 | US7683606 | US7688297 | US7715088 | US7729039 | US7733311 | US7733335 | US2010194733 | US2010194789 | US7787169 | US2010220121 | US2010265561 | US2010283804 | US7839564 | US7859742 | US2011063314 | US7952557 | US7956841 | US2011141156 | US7982479 | US2011175875 | US2011193840 | US2011193841 | US7999787 | US2011199671 | US8009348 | US2011221740 | US8077141 | US2012001957 | US8125501 | US8139050 | US2012098740 | US8174490 | US8243013 | US8274472 | US8289250 | US8300006 | US8305341 | US8314784 | US8373649 | US8384658 | US2013063333 | US8456414 | US8462102 | US2013194250 | US8537105 | US2013249782 | US8558783 | US8558785 | US8558786 | US8558855 | US8576164 | US8576259 | US8593396 | US2013321278 | US8605032 | US2014009817 | US8643595 | US8665206 | US8681191 | US2014085355 | US8730153 | US2014204012 | US2014218277 | US8810525 | US2014240210 | US2014240373 | US2014253425 | US2014292830 | US2014293398 | US2014333685 | US2014340734 | US2015005720 | US8928562 | US8928641 | US8976444 | US2015070744 | US2015097877 | US9013394 | US2015109283 | US9019197 | US9019198 | US9019318 | US9082352 | US2015213749 | US2015213765 | US2015221257 | US2015262255 | US2015277160 | US9171508 | US9218773 | US9224338 | US9224342 | US9224344 | US9230492 | US2016012710 | US9251736 | US9262973 | US9269311 | US9279906 | US2016071465 | US2016078820 | US9299294 | US2016093253 | US2016140910 | US9373289 | US2016180777 | US9390066 | US9390661 | US2016225322 | US9412314 | US2017148372 | - O'REGAN, B. et al., Nature, (19910000), vol. 353, page 737 | - WOOD, D., Information Display, (20020300), vol. 18, no. 3, page 24 | - BACH, U. et al., Adv. Mater., (20020000), vol. 14, no. 11, page 845 | - HAYES, R.A. et al., "Video-Speed Electronic Paper Based on Electrowetting", Nature, (20030000), vol. 425, doi:10.1038/nature01988, pages 383 - 385, XP002286158 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature01988 |