Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.02.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
02.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
31.10.2023 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
27.10.2023 | First examination report | |
01.02.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
25.01.2023 | Change - representative | |
15.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
02.02.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.07.2021 | Supplementary search report | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
16.07.2021 | Change - classification | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
16.07.2021 | Change - classification | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
26.03.2021 | Change: Validation states | published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] |
26.03.2021 | Change - extension states | published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] |
02.02.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.10.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
30.10.2020 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
06.10.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.08.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.08.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.07.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.07.2020 | Change - representative | |
24.07.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.07.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.07.2019 | New entry: applicant or inventor |