EP3983277 - A METHOD FOR ESTIMATING A LONGITUDINAL FORCE DIFFERENCE ACTING ON STEERED WHEELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLVO TRUCK CORPORATION 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [2022/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENDERSON, Leon Härsjödamm 132 438 92 Härryda / SE | 02 /
LAINE, Leo 438 94 Härryda / SE | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/16] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 19742292.6 | 11.06.2019 | [2022/16] | WO2019EP65155 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020249185 | Date: | 17.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3983277 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/04, B62D6/00, B60T8/1755 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
B62D5/0472 (EP);
B60W30/045 (US);
B60T8/1755 (EP);
B60T8/17551 (EP,US);
B60W10/18 (US);
B60W10/20 (US);
B62D6/003 (EP,US);
B62D6/006 (US);
G07C5/0808 (US);
G07C5/0816 (US);
B60Q9/00 (US);
B60T17/22 (US);
B60W2510/20 (US);
B60W2510/202 (US);
B60W2520/14 (US);
B60W2520/26 (US);
B60W2520/28 (US);
B60W2530/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ABSCHÄTZUNG EINER AUF GELENKTEN RÄDERN EINWIRKENDEN LÄNGSKRAFTDIFFERENZ | [2022/16] | English: | A METHOD FOR ESTIMATING A LONGITUDINAL FORCE DIFFERENCE ACTING ON STEERED WHEELS | [2022/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ESTIMATION D'UNE DIFFÉRENCE DE FORCE LONGITUDINALE AGISSANT SUR DES ROUES DIRECTRICES | [2022/16] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 09.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]DE102011001092 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [I] 1,8-10,17-20* paragraphs [0040] - [0042] - [0058] - [0063]; figures 1,8,9 *; | [XDAI]WO2019072379 (VOLVO TRUCK CORP [SE]) [XD] 1,2,5,8,16-20 * page 1, lines 17-24 * * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 21 * * page 5, line 10 - page 6, line 19 * * page 7, lines 19-30 * * page 8, lines 11-13,30 - page 9, line 2 * * page 12, lines 8-21 * * page 13, line 14 - page 14, line 35; figures 1-5; claims 1,3,5,17-20 * [A] 3,4,9-15 [I] 6,7 | by applicant | US2003221898 | WO2019072379 |