EP4000185 - A RADIO NETWORK NODE AND METHODS THEREIN FOR TRANSMITTING A TRANSMISSION CONFIGURATION INDICATION (TCI) UPDATE TO A WIRELESS DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANDSTRÖM, Anders Körvelvägen 3 96147 BODEN / SE | 02 /
THURFJELL, Magnus Trollnäsvägen 30 972 51 LULEÅ / SE | 03 /
SIMONSSON, Arne Sandåkersvägen 25 954 33 GAMMELSTAD / SE | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 7086 103 87 Stockholm / SE | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 19742332.0 | 15.07.2019 | [2022/21] | WO2019EP69015 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021008682 | Date: | 21.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4000185 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06, H04L5/00 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
H04B7/0695 (EP,US);
H04W16/28 (US);
H04B7/01 (US);
H04B7/0617 (US);
H04L5/0048 (EP);
H04L5/0051 (US);
H04L5/0023 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Title | German: | FUNKNETZKNOTEN UND VERFAHREN DARIN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG EINER AKTUALISIERUNG EINER SENDEKONFIGURATIONSANZEIGE (TCI) ZU EINEM DRAHTLOSEN GERÄT | [2022/21] | English: | A RADIO NETWORK NODE AND METHODS THEREIN FOR TRANSMITTING A TRANSMISSION CONFIGURATION INDICATION (TCI) UPDATE TO A WIRELESS DEVICE | [2022/21] | French: | NOEUD DE RÉSEAU RADIO ET PROCÉDÉS EN SON SEIN PERMETTANT DE TRANSMETTRE UNE MISE À JOUR D'INDICATION DE CONFIGURATION DE TRANSMISSION (TCI) À UN DISPOSITIF SANS FIL | [2022/21] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 15.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/06] | 04.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 15.02.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   01.03.2022 | 31.07.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]CN108632008 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [Y] 6,13 * abstract * [A] 2,7,9,14; | [XYI]WO2019097478 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1-3,8-10,15,16 * paragraphs [0076] , [0 97] - [0098] - [0112] - [0123]; figures 6,7 * [Y] 6,13 [I] 4,5,7,11,12,14; | EP3565349 [ ] (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [ ] * paragraphs [0060] , [ 109] , [0122] * |