EP3801283 - ENDOSCOPIC ULTRASOUND PROBE AND SHEATH FOR SUCH A PROBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Université Grenoble Alpes 621 Avenue Centrale 38400 Saint Martin d'Hères / FR | [2023/06] |
Former [2021/15] | For all designated states Université Grenoble Alpes 621 avenue Centrale 38400 Saint-Martin-d'Hères / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUSTILLON, Guillaume 4 Avenue du Grésivaudan 38130 Echirolles / FR | 02 /
DUBOIS, Nicolas 112 rue Louis Néel, B107 38330 Montbonnot Saint Martin / FR | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 19742435.1 | 03.06.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019FR51293 | Priority number, date | FR20180054803 | 01.06.2018 Original published format: FR 1854803 | [2021/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019229399 | Date: | 05.12.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3801283 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3801283 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/12, A61B8/08, A61B8/00 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
A61B8/4411 (EP);
A61B8/4422 (EP,US);
A61B8/0858 (EP,US);
A61B8/12 (EP,US);
A61B8/445 (EP,US);
A61B8/5223 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENDOSKOPISCHE ULTRASCHALLSONDE UND HÜLLE FÜR EINE SOLCHE SONDE | [2021/15] | English: | ENDOSCOPIC ULTRASOUND PROBE AND SHEATH FOR SUCH A PROBE | [2021/15] | French: | SONDE ECHOGRAPHIQUE ENDOSCOPIQUE ET GAINE POUR UNE TELLE SONDE | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 28.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 13.03.2024 | ES | 13.03.2024 | FI | 13.03.2024 | HR | 13.03.2024 | LT | 13.03.2024 | LV | 13.03.2024 | NL | 13.03.2024 | SE | 13.03.2024 | NO | 13.06.2024 | RS | 13.06.2024 | GR | 14.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
ES | 13.03.2024 | ||
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
LV | 13.03.2024 | ||
SE | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
ES | 13.03.2024 | ||
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
LV | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
ES | 13.03.2024 | ||
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 13.03.2024 | |
NO | 13.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9528129 (TETRAD CORP [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 19, line 4 - page 21, line 11 * * page 29, line 26 - page 30, line 19 * * claim 5 *; | [Y]WO0122866 (VISIONSCOPE INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 14, line 13 - page 15, line 16 * * figures 6A-6C *; | [A]WO2009108863 (BOSTON SCIENT SCIMED INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] ** figures 1-3 * | Examination | US5827313 |