15.08.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] |
02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
26.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] |
19.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
24.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
17.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
22.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] |
08.09.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] |
05.09.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
01.09.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.09.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.06.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.05.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.05.2023 |
Change - German title |
published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] |
19.05.2023 |
Change - English title |
published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] |
19.05.2023 |
Change - French title |
published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] |
28.04.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.02.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.02.2023 |
First examination report |
|
27.05.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.07.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] |
30.07.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] |
10.07.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
18.05.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.03.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
12.03.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
12.03.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
22.02.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.11.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.11.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.11.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
25.11.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.09.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
07.12.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.12.2019 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
31.07.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|