EP3802981 - RADIANT CEILING PANEL WITH A LIGHTING RECEPTACLE, AND USE OF A LIGHTING ELEMENT WITH SUCH A RADIANT CEILING PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/15] | TEMPERATURE -CONTROL BODY HAVING A LIGHTING ELEMENT RECEPTACLE | ||
[2023/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zehnder Group International AG Moortalstrasse 1 5722 Gränichen / CH | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WESCHLE, Hans-Peter Kreuzstrasse 11 77743 Neuried / DE | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Rentsch Partner AG Kirchenweg 8 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [2023/41] |
Former [2021/15] | Rentsch Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 203 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 19742460.9 | 23.05.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019IB54284 | Priority number, date | CH20180000668 | 28.05.2018 Original published format: CH 6682018 | [2021/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019229598 | Date: | 05.12.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3802981 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3802981 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E04B9/22, F21S8/02, F21V21/04, F24D3/16, F24F5/00 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
E04B9/006 (EP);
E04B9/225 (EP);
F21V33/006 (EP);
F24D3/165 (EP);
F24F5/0092 (EP);
F21S8/026 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DECKENSTRAHLPLATTE MIT EINER BELEUCHTUNGSAUFNAHME, SOWIE VERWENDUNG EINES BELEUCHTUNGSELEMENTS MIT EINER SOLCHEN DECKENSTRAHLPLATTE | [2023/25] | English: | RADIANT CEILING PANEL WITH A LIGHTING RECEPTACLE, AND USE OF A LIGHTING ELEMENT WITH SUCH A RADIANT CEILING PANEL | [2023/25] | French: | PANNEAU DE PLAFOND RAYONNANT AVEC LOGEMENT D'ÉCLAIRAGE, ET UTILISATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT D'ÉCLAIRAGE AVEC UN TEL PANNEAU DE PLAFOND RAYONNANT | [2023/25] |
Former [2021/15] | TEMPERIERKÖRPER MIT EINER BELEUCHTUNGSAUFNAHME | ||
Former [2021/15] | TEMPERATURE -CONTROL BODY HAVING A LIGHTING ELEMENT RECEPTACLE | ||
Former [2021/15] | CORPS DE RÉGULATION DE TEMPÉRATURE AVEC LOGEMENT D'ÉCLAIRAGE | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 25.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 11.10.2023 | DK | 11.10.2023 | EE | 11.10.2023 | ES | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | IT | 11.10.2023 | LT | 11.10.2023 | LV | 11.10.2023 | NL | 11.10.2023 | PL | 11.10.2023 | RO | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SE | 11.10.2023 | SK | 11.10.2023 | SM | 11.10.2023 | BG | 11.01.2024 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | PT | 12.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 11.10.2023 | |
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | DK | 11.10.2023 | |
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 11.10.2023 | |
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 11.10.2023 | |
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 11.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2741016 (MÜLLER RALPH [DE]) [A] 1,25,27* paragraphs [0001] , [00 2] , [00 8] , [0 18] - [0022]; figure 3 *; | [XI]DE202015101209U (ERWIN MÜLLER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,8-10,12-16,21,22,24-27 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0005] - [0 12] - [0014] * [I] 5,7,11,17-20,23; | [XI]US2016178145 (OLESKE PETER J [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,9,11-27 * paragraphs [0103] , [0112] - [0116] - [0121] , [0187] , [0188] , [0250] - [0264] * * paragraphs [0286] - [0307] - [0317] , [ 338] - [0341] * * figures 4A-C, 6, 7, 13, 18A-B, 19A-C, 30, 32A-B, 34B, 35 * * figures 37, 41, 42A-D, 43A-C, 44A-C, 45A-B, 47C, 49A-F * [I] 7,10 | Examination | US2017175961 | WO2019197991 |