EP3823788 - HOLDING ELEMENT FOR A SUPPORTING AND/OR GUIDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Festool GmbH Wertstrasse 20 73240 Wendlingen am Neckar / DE | [2021/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPENGLER, Wolfgang Heckenäckerweg 7 73272 Neidlingen / DE | [2021/21] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Bregenzer und Reule Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Neckarstraße 47 73728 Esslingen / DE | [2021/21] | Application number, filing date | 19742594.5 | 19.07.2019 | [2021/21] | WO2019EP69599 | Priority number, date | DE201810117678 | 20.07.2018 Original published format: DE102018117678 | [2021/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020016447 | Date: | 23.01.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3823788 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q9/00 | [2021/21] | CPC: |
B27B9/04 (EP,US);
B23Q9/0042 (EP,US);
B25H1/0078 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] | Title | German: | HALTEELEMENT FÜR EINE VORRICHTUNG ZUM STÜTZEN UND/ODER FÜHREN | [2021/21] | English: | HOLDING ELEMENT FOR A SUPPORTING AND/OR GUIDING DEVICE | [2021/21] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE RETENUE POUR UN DISPOSITIF DE SUPPORT ET/OU DE GUIDAGE | [2021/21] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 15.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO03049899 (BOEING CO [US]); | [A]DE102009029108 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [XDA]DE202013104555U (TRUMPF GRUESCH AG [CH]); | [A]WO2017150812 (KOREA MACH & MATERIALS INST [KR]) | by applicant | WO9211332 | DE102007009641 | DE102008059838 | DE202013104555U | DE202016003907U |