EP3830254 - NOVEL ESTERASES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.06.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carbios Site de Cataroux 8 rue de la Grolière 63100 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | [2023/08] |
Former [2021/23] | For all designated states Carbios Rue Emile Duclaux Biopôle Clermont-Limagne 63360 Saint-Beauzire / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVID, Benoît Spandauer Strasse 22 40599 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
ANDRE, Isabelle 1 rue de l'Aqueduc 31500 Toulouse / FR | 03 /
BEN KHALED, Maher 6 chemin des Sauges Apt 302 31400 Toulouse / FR | 04 /
DUQUESNE, Sophie 9 rue Benezet 31300 Toulouse / FR | 05 /
MARTY, Alain 20 Rue Volta 31000 Toulouse / FR | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Becker et Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [2021/23] | Application number, filing date | 19742619.0 | 26.07.2019 | [2021/23] | WO2019EP70287 | Priority number, date | EP20180306018 | 27.07.2018 Original published format: EP 18306018 | [2021/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020021116 | Date: | 30.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3830254 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/18 | [2021/23] | CPC: |
C12N9/18 (EP,KR,US);
C12N9/16 (US);
C08J11/10 (KR,US);
C08J11/105 (KR,US);
C11D3/38636 (KR,US);
C12N15/52 (KR,US);
C12N15/70 (KR);
C12Y301/01074 (KR,US);
C07K2319/21 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE ESTERASEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2021/23] | English: | NOVEL ESTERASES AND USES THEREOF | [2021/23] | French: | NOUVELLES ESTÉRASES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2021/23] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 09.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M06) [2022/17] | 28.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | EP24185157.5 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2012099018 (AMANO ENZYME INC [JP], et al); | [AD]WO2018011284 (CARBIOS [FR]); | by applicant | WO2013093355 | WO2016198650 | WO2016198652 | WO2017198786 | WO2018011284 | WO2018011281 | WO2019043145 | WO2019043134 |