EP3785069 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DISPLAYING AN AUTO-STEREOSCOPIC IMAGE WITH N VIEW POINTS ON A MOBILE DISPLAY SCREEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alioscopy 3 rue de l'Est 75020 Paris / FR | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLIO, Pierre 81 Rue de la Mare 75020 Paris / FR | 02 /
MAINGREAUD, Flavien 14 allée du Vexin 95450 Commeny / FR | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | Bringer IP 1, Place du Président Thomas Wilson 31000 Toulouse / FR | [2021/09] | Application number, filing date | 19742822.0 | 15.04.2019 | [2021/09] | WO2019FR50881 | Priority number, date | FR20180053569 | 24.04.2018 Original published format: FR 1853569 | [2021/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019207235 | Date: | 31.10.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3785069 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3785069 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G02B30/29, H04N13/317, H04N13/324, H04N13/305, G02B27/00 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
G02B27/0093 (EP,KR);
G02B30/29 (EP,KR);
H04N13/305 (EP,KR);
H04N13/317 (EP,KR);
H04N13/324 (EP,KR)
|
Former IPC [2021/09] | G02B27/22, G02B27/00, H04N13/305 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANZEIGE EINES AUTOSTEREOSKOPISCHEN BILDES MIT N-ANSICHTSPUNKTEN AUF EINEM MOBILEN BILDSCHIRM | [2021/09] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DISPLAYING AN AUTO-STEREOSCOPIC IMAGE WITH N VIEW POINTS ON A MOBILE DISPLAY SCREEN | [2021/09] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'AFFICHAGE D'UNE IMAGE AUTO-STÉRÉOSCOPIQUE À N POINTS DE VUE SUR UN ÉCRAN D'AFFICHAGE MOBILE | [2021/09] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 24.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 22.11.2023 | ES | 22.11.2023 | HR | 22.11.2023 | PL | 22.11.2023 | RO | 22.11.2023 | RS | 22.11.2023 | SK | 22.11.2023 | SM | 22.11.2023 | NO | 22.02.2024 | GR | 23.02.2024 | IS | 22.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RO | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 23.02.2024 | |
IS | 22.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2009101558 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 2-14 * abstract * * figure 2 * * page 5, lines 27-33 * * page 7, line 3 - line 25 *; | [Y]WO2014163214 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 2-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0070] , [0179] *; | [Y]EP2876879 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 2-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] - [0030] , [0039] , [0050] - [0052] - [0063] , [0064] , [0084] , [0086] * * figures 2A,5,8,9C,9D *; | [A] - HONG H K ET AL, "Autostereoscopic multi-view 3D display with pivot function, using the image display of the square subpixel structure", DISPLAYS DEVICES, DEMPA PUBLICATIONS, TOKYO, JP, vol. 29, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.DISPLA.2008.06.001, ISSN 0141-9382, (20081201), pages 512 - 520, (20080619), XP025589405 [A] 2-14 * abstract * * alinéa 3 * * figure 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.displa.2008.06.001 | Examination | GB2415850 | US2014022619 | EP2717247 | US2016150220 | by applicant | WO2006024764 | WO2013140363 | WO2014016768 | WO2014041504 | WO2018FR50563 |