EP3791400 - SYSTEM FOR ANALYZING A PEDALLING TECHNIQUE OF A CYCLIST AND ASSOCIATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAL Inc 333 W Maude Ave STE 207 Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | [2023/36] |
Former [2021/11] | For all designated states Zhor Tech 7 Place Stanislas 54000 Nancy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OUMNIA, Karim 52, rue Stanislas 54000 NANCY / FR | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | A.P.I. Conseil Immeuble Newton 4, rue Jules Ferry 64000 Pau / FR | [2021/11] | Application number, filing date | 19742825.3 | 13.05.2019 | [2021/11] | WO2019FR51080 | Priority number, date | FR20180070552 | 11.05.2018 Original published format: FR 1870552 | [2021/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019215418 | Date: | 14.11.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3791400 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G16H20/30, G16H40/67, A63B24/00, A43B3/00, A61B5/11, A43B5/14, B62M3/08 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
G16H20/30 (EP,US);
A43B3/34 (EP,US);
A43B5/14 (EP,US);
A61B5/1124 (EP);
A63B24/0062 (US);
B62J45/412 (EP,US);
B62J45/421 (US);
G01C19/00 (US);
G01P15/08 (US);
G01P15/18 (US);
G16H40/67 (EP,US);
G16H50/30 (US);
A43B17/00 (EP);
A63B2220/40 (US);
A63B2220/836 (US);
G16H50/70 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ANALYSE EINER PEDALBEWEGUNGSTECHNIK EINES RADFAHRERS UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN | [2021/11] | English: | SYSTEM FOR ANALYZING A PEDALLING TECHNIQUE OF A CYCLIST AND ASSOCIATED METHODS | [2021/11] | French: | SYSTEME POUR L'ANALYSE DE LA TECHNIQUE DE PEDALAGE D'UN CYCLISTE ET PROCEDES ASSOCIES | [2021/11] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 19.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2014222173 (GIEDWOYN ANNA ANTONIA [US], et al); | [XYI]US2015177083 (REDMOND BARRY [IE]); | [IY]US2016180440 (DIBENEDETTO CHRISTIAN [US], et al); | [IY]US2017188950 (GAZDAG BENCE [US], et al) | by applicant | EP1637445 | WO2010000369 | WO2010014242 | US2017188950 |