EP3744791 - POLYCARBONATE RESIN COMPOSITION, PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR, AND OPTICAL LENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2025 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 05.03.2025 [2025/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8324 / JP | [2020/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIRATAKE, Munenori c/o MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. Kashima Plant, 35, Towada Kamisu-shi, Ibaraki 314-0102 / JP | 02 /
ISHIHARA, Kentaro c/o MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. Tokyo Research Laboratory, 1-1, Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-8601 / JP | 03 /
HIROSE, Koji c/o MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8324 / JP | 04 /
IKEDA, Shinya c/o MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. Tokyo Research Laboratory, 1-1, Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-8601 / JP | 05 /
KATO, Noriyuki c/o MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8324 / JP | 06 /
KONDO, Mitsuteru c/o MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. Tokyo Research Laboratory, 1-1, Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-8601 / JP | 07 /
SUZUKI, Shoko c/o MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. Tokyo Research Laboratory, 1-1, Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-8601 / JP | 08 /
OSHIMA, Kensuke c/o MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. Tokyo Research Laboratory, 1-1, Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-8601 / JP | 09 /
NAGAYAMA, Shuya c/o MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. Tokyo Research Laboratory, 1-1, Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-8601 / JP | [2023/36] |
Former [2020/49] | 01 /
SHIRATAKE, Munenori c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc., Kashima Plant, 35, Towada Kamisu-shi, Ibaraki 314-0102 / JP | ||
02 /
ISHIHARA, Kentaro c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc., Tokyo Research Laboratory, 1-1, Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-8601 / JP | |||
03 /
HIROSE, Koji c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc., 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8324 / JP | |||
04 /
IKEDA, Shinya c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc., Tokyo Research Laboratory, 1-1, Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-8601 / JP | |||
05 /
KATO, Noriyuki c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc., 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8324 / JP | |||
06 /
KONDO, Mitsuteru c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc., Tokyo Research Laboratory, 1-1, Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-8601 / JP | |||
07 /
SUZUKI, Shoko c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc., Tokyo Research Laboratory, 1-1, Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-8601 / JP | |||
08 /
OSHIMA, Kensuke c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc., Tokyo Research Laboratory, 1-1, Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-8601 / JP | |||
09 /
NAGAYAMA, Shuya c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc., Tokyo Research Laboratory, 1-1, Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-8601 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/49] | Application number, filing date | 19743561.3 | 18.01.2019 | [2020/49] | WO2019JP01375 | Priority number, date | JP20180009024 | 23.01.2018 Original published format: JP 2018009024 | [2020/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019146507 | Date: | 01.08.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3744791 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3744791 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08L69/00, C08G64/04, C08K5/13, C08K5/51, G02B1/04, C08G64/06, C08K5/00, C08K5/134, C08K5/526 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
C08G64/06 (EP,US);
C08G64/04 (KR);
C08J5/18 (KR);
C08K5/005 (EP,KR);
C08K5/13 (KR);
C08K5/134 (EP,US);
C08K5/524 (KR,US);
C08K5/526 (EP);
C08L69/00 (KR,US);
G02B1/04 (KR);
G02B1/041 (EP,KR,US);
C08L2203/16 (US);
C08L2203/30 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/005, C08L69/00 (EP);
C08K5/134, C08L69/00 (EP);
C08K5/526, C08L69/00 (EP);
G02B1/041, C08L69/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2020/49] | C08L69/00, C08G64/04, C08K5/13, C08K5/51, G02B1/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYCARBONATHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND OPTISCHE LINSE | [2020/49] | English: | POLYCARBONATE RESIN COMPOSITION, PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR, AND OPTICAL LENS | [2020/49] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE DE POLYCARBONATE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION ET LENTILLE OPTIQUE | [2020/49] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2020 | Translation filed | 01.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 01.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/49] | 27.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2023 | BG | 06.09.2023 | CZ | 06.09.2023 | DK | 06.09.2023 | EE | 06.09.2023 | ES | 06.09.2023 | FI | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | LT | 06.09.2023 | LV | 06.09.2023 | MC | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SE | 06.09.2023 | SI | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | PT | 08.01.2024 | IE | 18.01.2024 | LU | 18.01.2024 | CH | 31.01.2024 | [2025/10] |
Former [2024/51] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
BG | 06.09.2023 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SI | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
LU | 18.01.2024 | ||
CH | 31.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/48] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SI | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
LU | 18.01.2024 | ||
CH | 31.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/43] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SI | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
LU | 18.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/40] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SI | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SI | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2918621 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [XP]WO2018016516 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | EP3489279 [ ] (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) | International search | [Y]WO2009014050 (TEIJIN CHEMICALS LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2017020043 (SUMIKA STYRON POLYCARBONATE); | [Y]JP2017179323 (OSAKA GAS CHEM KK); | [PY]WO2018016516 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [PY]JP2018104691 (OSAKA GAS CHEM KK) | by applicant | JPS5442800B | JPH0625398 | WO2007142149 |