Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
05.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.08.2023 | Change - representative | |
30.01.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
06.01.2023 | Change - applicant | published on 08.02.2023 [2023/06] |
24.03.2022 | Change - representative | |
25.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
28.01.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.10.2021 | Supplementary search report | published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] |
08.10.2021 | Change - classification | published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] |
08.10.2021 | Change - classification | published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] |
26.03.2021 | Change: Validation states | published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] |
26.03.2021 | Change - extension states | published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] |
29.01.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.10.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
16.10.2020 | Request for examination filed | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
06.10.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.09.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.09.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.09.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.08.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant | |
12.08.2020 | Change - representative | |
12.08.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.08.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.08.2019 | New entry: applicant or inventor |