Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019147691 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862620914 | 23.01.2018 | US201916255232 | 23.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024279946 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016883260 | 26.05.2020 | US202217690606 | 09.03.2022 | US202418651574 | 30.04.2024 | US201862620914 | 23.01.2018 | US201916255232 | 23.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12006722 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2024 | B2 | US2022195743 | 23.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016883260 | 26.05.2020 | US202217690606 | 09.03.2022 | US201862620914 | 23.01.2018 | US201916255232 | 23.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11332948 | Global Dossier | 17.05.2022 | B2 | US2020284056 | 10.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016883260 | 26.05.2020 | US201862620914 | 23.01.2018 | US201916255232 | 23.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10711473 | Global Dossier | 14.07.2020 | B2 | US2019226222 | 25.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862620914 | 23.01.2018 | US201916255232 | 23.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3737476 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2021 | A4 | EP3737476 | 18.11.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US14780 | 23.01.2019 | US201862620914 | 23.01.2018 |