EP3737476 - ARENA APPARATUS AND METHODS OF USING AND CONSTRUCTING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SENSEI LTD Suite 202, 2nd Floor Eden Plaza, Eden Island PO Box 1352 Mahe / SC | [2023/06] |
Former [2020/47] | For all designated states Koko Sports Management, LLC 95 Merrick Way Coral Gables FL 33134 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEPIETRO, Michael 15 Liqueur Road Plandome Manor, NY 11030 / US | 02 /
BRYAN, Robert 8600 Ponce De Leon Road Miami, FL 33143 / US | [2020/47] | Representative(s) | Page White Farrer Bedford House 21a John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/47] | Swea IP Law AB P.O. Box 44 151 21 Södertälje / SE | Application number, filing date | 19744007.6 | 23.01.2019 | [2020/47] | WO2019US14780 | Priority number, date | US201862620914P | 23.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862620914 P | [2020/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019147691 | Date: | 01.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3737476 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A63C19/00, A63F9/00, E04H3/26, E04H3/14, E04B5/12, E04B5/10, E04B5/02, E04B5/14 | [2021/45] | CPC: |
E04B5/026 (EP);
E04H3/12 (US);
A63C19/005 (EP);
E04B2/56 (US);
E04B5/10 (EP);
E04B5/12 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/47] | A63C19/00, A63F9/00, E04H3/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/47] | Title | German: | ARENAVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG UND HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2020/47] | English: | ARENA APPARATUS AND METHODS OF USING AND CONSTRUCTING SAME | [2020/47] | French: | ÉQUIPEMENT DE TERRAIN DE JEUX ET SES PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION ET DE CONSTRUCTION | [2020/47] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 11.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/47] | 25.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5182824 (CIPRIANO NICKOLAS A [US]); | [XAY]US7731594 (HANSEN CHRISTOPHER L [US]); | [XY]US2011012310 (ANDERTON RIC [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US1753328 (LEW BARNES); | [A]US7731594 (HANSEN CHRISTOPHER L [US]); | [XY]US2011012310 (ANDERTON RIC [US], et al); | [A]US8675696 (TAUBMAN MATTHEW S [US], et al) | by applicant | US5182824 | US7731594 | US2011012310 |