EP3829360 - SYSTEM COMPRISING AEROSOL-GENERATING DEVICE AND ADAPTER ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ACCONCIA, Federica Corso Umberto I 19 Curteri Mercato San Severino 84085 Salerno / IT | 02 /
PRESTIA, Ivan Via Fratelli Rosselli 4 40069 Zola Predosa / IT | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Abitz & Partner, et al Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/23] | Siepmann, Felix, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Arabellastraße 17 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19745173.5 | 01.08.2019 | [2021/23] | WO2019EP70762 | Priority number, date | EP20180187101 | 02.08.2018 Original published format: EP 18187101 | [2021/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020025746 | Date: | 06.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3829360 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3829360 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/40 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
A24F40/40 (EP,KR,US);
A24F40/46 (KR,US);
A24D1/20 (KR,US);
A24F40/20 (EP,KR,US);
A24F40/51 (KR,US);
A24F40/53 (US);
A24F40/57 (US);
A24F40/60 (KR,US);
A24F47/00 (RU,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/23] | A24F47/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM MIT AEROSOLERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND ADAPTERELEMENT | [2021/23] | English: | SYSTEM COMPRISING AEROSOL-GENERATING DEVICE AND ADAPTER ELEMENT | [2021/23] | French: | SYSTÈME COMPRENANT UN DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOLS ET ÉLÉMENT ADAPTATEUR | [2023/04] |
Former [2021/23] | SYSTÈME COMPRENANT UN DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOL ET UN ÉLÉMENT ADAPTATEUR | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 12.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 01.11.2023 | ES | 01.11.2023 | HR | 01.11.2023 | PL | 01.11.2023 | RS | 01.11.2023 | SK | 01.11.2023 | SM | 01.11.2023 | NO | 01.02.2024 | GR | 02.02.2024 | IS | 01.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 02.02.2024 | |
IS | 01.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]WO2013076098 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) [X] 1-8,10,11,16 * page 8, line 2 - page 9, line 6; figure - * * page 12, line 4 - line 20 * [A] 9,12,13,17-19 [I] 14,15; | [XA]WO2015197627 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [X] 1-8,10,11,16 * page 22, line 17 - page 23, line 6; figure 7 * [A] 9,12-15,17-19; | [XAI]WO2017068099 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [X] 1,4,5,8-10,16 * page 21, line 21 - page 23, line 21 * * page 33, line 19 - line 29; figures 10,11 * * page 34, line 30 - page 35, line 3 * [A] 3,6,7,11-13,17-19 [I] 2,14,15; | [XP]WO2018206615 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [XP] 1,2,4,5,7,8,10,16 * page 13, line 11 - page 14, line 12; figure - ** page 23, line 3 - page 24, line 10 * | Examination | WO2019101947 | WO2019129470 |