EP3820352 - ENDOSCOPE CLEANING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United States Endoscopy Group, Inc. 5976 Heisley Road Mentor, OH 44060 / US | [2021/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAYE, Christopher J. 7007 W. White Dove Lane Apt. 104 Middleburg Heights, Ohio 44130 / US | 02 /
HAACK, Scott 12805 Big Creek Ridge Drive Chardon, Ohio 44024 / US | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2021/20] | Application number, filing date | 19745534.8 | 10.07.2019 | [2021/20] | WO2019US41232 | Priority number, date | US201862696270P | 10.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862696270 P | [2021/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020014382 | Date: | 16.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3820352 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/12, B08B9/043, A46B9/00, A46B9/02, A46B9/04, A61B90/70 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
A61B1/122 (EP);
A61B90/70 (EP,US);
A46B5/06 (EP,US);
A46B9/02 (US);
A46B2200/3013 (EP,US);
A46B2200/3093 (US);
A61B2090/701 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/20] | Title | German: | ENDOSKOPREINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/20] | English: | ENDOSCOPE CLEANING DEVICE | [2021/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE D'ENDOSCOPE | [2021/20] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/20] | 09.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2001258839 (FUJI PHOTO OPTICAL CO LTD); | [X]JP3650479B ; | [X]WO2007013196 (COSMO INSTR CO LTD [JP], et al); | [X]US2010065083 (SOETERMANS MAXIMILIANO [US]); | [X]US2011258798 (NAFTAL BRIAN [US]); | [X]US2016175560 (TALLARIDA STEVEN J [US], et al); | [X]US2017258214 (BORSARI MARK N [US]) |