EP3793902 - IMPROVED FIRE RESISTANCE DEVICE DESIGNED TO BE PLACED BETWEEN ONE END OF A MOUNTING STRUT FOR AN AIRCRAFT TURBOMACHINE AND A COWLING OF SAID TURBOMACHINE, DELIMITING AN INTER-FLOW COMPARTMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAFRAN AIRCRAFT ENGINES 2 boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [2021/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACON, Bruno, Alexandre, Didier c/o Cepi Safran Rond-Point René Ravaud -Réau 77550 Moissy-Cramayel / FR | 02 /
ACHBARI, Baghdad c/o Cepi Safran Rond-Point René Ravaud -Réau 77550 Moissy-Cramayel / FR | 03 /
SIMONOTTI, Hervé c/o Cepi Safran Rond-Point René Ravaud -Réau 77550 Moissy-Cramayel / FR | [2021/12] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/12] | Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 19745711.2 | 25.06.2019 | [2021/12] | WO2019FR51554 | Priority number, date | FR20180056041 | 29.06.2018 Original published format: FR 1856041 | [2021/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020002822 | Date: | 02.01.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3793902 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3793902 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B64D27/26, F02C7/25, B64D45/00, F16J15/06, F16J15/02, F02C7/28 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
B64D27/402 (EP);
B64D27/40 (US);
F02C7/20 (EP,US);
F02C7/25 (EP,US);
B64D2045/009 (EP,US);
B64D27/18 (US);
F02C7/28 (US);
F05D2220/323 (US);
F05D2230/53 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE BRANDSCHUTZVORRICHTUNG ZUR POSITIONIERUNG ZWISCHEN EINEM ENDE EINER STREBE FÜR EINE FLUGZEUG-TURBOMASCHINE UND EINER VERKLEIDUNG DIESER TURBOMASCHINE ZUR BEGRENZUNG EINER ZWISCHENSTROMKAMMER | [2021/12] | English: | IMPROVED FIRE RESISTANCE DEVICE DESIGNED TO BE PLACED BETWEEN ONE END OF A MOUNTING STRUT FOR AN AIRCRAFT TURBOMACHINE AND A COWLING OF SAID TURBOMACHINE, DELIMITING AN INTER-FLOW COMPARTMENT | [2021/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RESISTANCE AU FEU AMELIORE DESTINE A ETRE INTERPOSE ENTRE UNE EXTREMITE DE MAT D'ACCROCHAGE DE TURBOMACHINE D'AERONEF, ET UN CAPOTAGE DE LA TURBOMACHINE DELIMITANT UN COMPARTIMENT INTER-VEINE | [2021/12] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 18.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.06.2019 | AL | 11.05.2022 | AT | 11.05.2022 | CY | 11.05.2022 | CZ | 11.05.2022 | DK | 11.05.2022 | EE | 11.05.2022 | ES | 11.05.2022 | FI | 11.05.2022 | HR | 11.05.2022 | IT | 11.05.2022 | LT | 11.05.2022 | LV | 11.05.2022 | MC | 11.05.2022 | MK | 11.05.2022 | MT | 11.05.2022 | NL | 11.05.2022 | PL | 11.05.2022 | RO | 11.05.2022 | RS | 11.05.2022 | SE | 11.05.2022 | SI | 11.05.2022 | SK | 11.05.2022 | SM | 11.05.2022 | IE | 25.06.2022 | LU | 25.06.2022 | BE | 30.06.2022 | CH | 30.06.2022 | LI | 30.06.2022 | BG | 11.08.2022 | NO | 11.08.2022 | GR | 12.08.2022 | IS | 11.09.2022 | PT | 12.09.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/25] | HU | 25.06.2019 | |
AL | 11.05.2022 | ||
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CY | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
IT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
MK | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
IE | 25.06.2022 | ||
LU | 25.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CY | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
IT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
MK | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
IE | 25.06.2022 | ||
LU | 25.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CY | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
IT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
IE | 25.06.2022 | ||
LU | 25.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
IT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
IE | 25.06.2022 | ||
LU | 25.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
IE | 25.06.2022 | ||
LU | 25.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
IE | 25.06.2022 | ||
LU | 25.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
IE | 25.06.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2015098810 (SORIA CHRISTIAN [US], et al); | [A]US2015175272 (BROCHARD WOLFGANG [FR], et al); | [A]US2018156129 (TAKEUCHI AKIRA [JP]); | [A]US2018156051 (STRUTT ANDREW JOHN [US]); | [A]US2018163631 (TAKEUCHI AKIRA [JP]) |