EP3821415 - ENHANCED ROBUSTNESS FOR HIGH SENSITIVITY FIBER OPTIC SMOKE DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carrier Corporation 13995 Pasteur Blvd. Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 / US | [2021/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIRNKRANT, Michael J. 411 Silver Lane East Hartford, Connecticut 06108 / US | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2021/20] | Application number, filing date | 19746258.3 | 11.07.2019 | [2021/20] | WO2019US41374 | Priority number, date | US201862697550P | 13.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862697550 P | [2021/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020014461 | Date: | 16.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3821415 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G08B17/107, G01N21/53 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
G08B17/107 (EP,US);
G01N21/65 (EP,US);
G01N21/274 (EP);
G01N21/53 (EP);
G01N2021/4742 (EP);
G01N2201/0633 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/20] | Title | German: | ERHÖHTE ROBUSTHEIT FÜR HOCHEMPFINDLICHE FASEROPTISCHE RAUCHDETEKTION | [2021/20] | English: | ENHANCED ROBUSTNESS FOR HIGH SENSITIVITY FIBER OPTIC SMOKE DETECTION | [2021/20] | French: | ROBUSTESSE AMÉLIORÉE POUR LA DÉTECTION DE FUMÉE PAR FIBRE OPTIQUE À HAUTE SENSIBILITÉ | [2021/20] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/20] | 05.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE102013213721 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 4,13,15,21* figures 1-5 *; | [IY]WO2018089474 (CARRIER CORP [US]) [I] 1,3,5-12,14,16-20,22 * abstract * * paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0084] * [Y] 2,4,13,15,21; | [Y]WO2018089478 (CARRIER CORP [US]) [Y] 2 * claims 7,18 * |