EP3799563 - SPRAY HEAD FOR A DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A STREAM OF AIR IN THE OUTER EAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/14] | ATTACHMENT FOR A DEVICE FOR GENERATING AN AIR FLOW INTO THE EXTERNAL AUDITORY CANAL | ||
[2022/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EARBREEZE GMBH Wipplingerstraße 1/DG 1 1010 Wien / AT | [2021/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KURSCHEL, Martin Wipplingerstraße 1 1.DG 1010 Wien / AT | [2021/14] | Representative(s) | KLIMENT & HENHAPEL Patentanwälte OG Gonzagagasse 15/2 1010 Wien / AT | [2022/34] |
Former [2021/14] | KLIMENT & HENHAPEL Patentanwälte OG Gonzagagasse 15/2 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 19746442.3 | 12.07.2019 | [2021/14] | WO2019EP68915 | Priority number, date | EP20180183454 | 13.07.2018 Original published format: EP 18183454 | [2021/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020012028 | Date: | 16.01.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3799563 | Date: | 07.04.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3799563 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61F11/00, A61M3/02, A61F7/12 | [2021/14] | CPC: |
A61F11/00 (EP);
A61M3/0279 (EP,US);
A61F11/08 (US);
A61F7/12 (EP,US);
A61F11/085 (US);
A61F2007/0005 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0059 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0069 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0087 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFSATZ FÜR EINE VORRICHTUNG ZUR GENERIERUNG EINES LUFTSTROMES IN DEN ÄUSSEREN GEHÖRGANG | [2021/14] | English: | SPRAY HEAD FOR A DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A STREAM OF AIR IN THE OUTER EAR | [2022/13] | French: | EMBOUT POUR UN DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'UN FLUX D'AIR DANS LE CONDUIT AUDITIF EXTERNE | [2022/13] |
Former [2021/14] | ATTACHMENT FOR A DEVICE FOR GENERATING AN AIR FLOW INTO THE EXTERNAL AUDITORY CANAL | ||
Former [2021/14] | EMBOUT POUR UN DISPOSITIF SERVANT À GÉNÉRER UN FLUX D'AIR DANS LE CONDUIT AUDITIF EXTERNE | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/14] | 30.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 24.08.2022 | EE | 24.08.2022 | LT | 24.08.2022 | LV | 24.08.2022 | MC | 24.08.2022 | RO | 24.08.2022 | RS | 24.08.2022 | SM | 24.08.2022 | GR | 25.11.2022 | IS | 24.12.2022 | [2024/14] |
Former [2023/29] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | EE | 24.08.2022 | |
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | LT | 24.08.2022 | |
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 24.08.2022 | |
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | LT | 24.08.2022 | |
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | LT | 24.08.2022 | |
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | LT | 24.08.2022 | |
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | LT | 24.08.2022 | |
RS | 24.08.2022 | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0243261 (SANOFI SA [FR]) [AD] 1-31 * page 2, line 10 - page 8, line 11; figures 1-11 *; | [AD]DE69214690T (D & D SRL [IT]) [AD] 1-6,9-21,25-29 * page 2, line 31 - page 7, line 5; figures 1-3; claims 1-7 *; | [A]US2011099832 (BIKHAZI HENRY B [US]) [A] 1,19,20,29,30 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0045]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]WO2012166801 (MYSTIC PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [A] 30* paragraph [0077]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2015090191 (KOKENIS LOUIS J [US]) [A] 1,19-24 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0043]; figures 1-11 *; | [A]US2018125345 (REBELLA GREG [US], et al) [A] 1-18,21 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0097]; figures 11-18 * | by applicant | EP0243261 | DE69214690T | EP0937422 |