EP3747967 - ANTI-STICKING ADHESIVE TAPE FOR MOLDING OF COMPOSITE MATERIAL AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nitto Denko (Shanghai Songjiang) Co., Ltd. 716 Lianyang Road Songjiang Industrial Zone Shanghai 201613 / CN | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2020/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Xu 716 Lianyang Road, Songjiang Industrial Zone Shanghai 201613 / CN | 02 /
WATANABE, Yoshinori 1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567--8680 / JP | 03 /
TIAN, Song 716 Lianyang Road, Songjiang Industrial Zone Shanghai 201613 / CN | 04 /
LIU, Jifeng 716 Lianyang Road, Songjiang Industrial Zone Shanghai 201613 / CN | [2020/50] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2020/50] | Application number, filing date | 19746717.8 | 23.01.2019 | [2020/50] | WO2019CN72782 | Priority number, date | CN20181089532 | 30.01.2018 Original published format: CN201810089532 | [2020/50] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019149119 | Date: | 08.08.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3747967 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/00, C08J5/08, B32B27/12, C09J11/04 | [2021/08] | CPC: |
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
C09J7/29 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/12 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/304 (EP,US);
B32B27/322 (EP,US);
B32B5/02 (EP,US);
C08J5/08 (EP);
C09J183/04 (KR);
C09J5/06 (KR);
C09J7/201 (US);
C09J7/22 (KR);
C09J7/38 (KR,US);
C09J7/40 (KR);
B32B2255/02 (EP,US);
B32B2255/10 (EP,US);
B32B2255/26 (EP,US);
B32B2262/101 (EP,US);
B32B2307/732 (EP);
B32B2307/748 (EP,US);
B32B2405/00 (EP,US);
C09J2301/12 (EP,US);
C09J2301/122 (CN,US);
C09J2301/16 (US);
C09J2301/208 (EP,US);
C09J2301/302 (US);
C09J2301/312 (EP,KR);
C09J2400/143 (EP,US);
C09J2427/003 (US);
C09J2483/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1476 (US);
Y10T428/28 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/50] | C09J7/00, C08J5/08, B32B27/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] | Title | German: | ANTIHAFTKLEBEBAND ZUM FORMEN VON VERBUNDMATERIAL UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2020/50] | English: | ANTI-STICKING ADHESIVE TAPE FOR MOLDING OF COMPOSITE MATERIAL AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR AND USE THEREOF | [2020/50] | French: | BANDE ADHÉSIVE ANTIADHÉSIVE POUR LE MOULAGE D'UN MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET UTILISATION | [2020/50] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2020 | Translation filed | 30.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 30.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/50] | 27.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2013181431 (SAINT GOBAIN PERFORMANCE PLAST [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XYI]WO2016164535 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,10,13,14 * page 7, line 10 - line 13; figures 1-5 * * page 15, paragraph 35 * * page 20, paragraph 49 * * page 25, paragraph 62 * * page 40, paragraphs 119-121 * * page 41, paragraph 126 * * page 42, paragraphs 129-131 * * page 49, paragraph 160 - page 50 * [Y] 7-9 [I] 7-9,11,12,15; | [A]WO2017012962 (TESA SE [DE]) [A] 1-15 * page 6, lines 5-20; claim 1 * * page 6, lines 30-32 * * page 7, lines 29-32 * * page 10, lines 4-16 * * page 11, paragraphs 5-18 * * page 15, lines 13-21 * * page 17, lines 10-12 * * claims 1-13 *; | [Y] - CAO Y ET AL, "Impact properties of silica particle modified glass fiber reinforced epoxy composite", JOURNAL OF REINFORCED PLASTICS AND COMPOSITES, TECHNOMIC PUBLISHING, US, (20060501), vol. 25, no. 7, doi:10.1177/0731684406063536, ISSN 0731-6844, pages 761 - 769, XP002505299 [Y] 7-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/0731684406063536 | International search | [A]US6602373 (MCGUIRE JR JAMES E [US])[A] 1-15; | [Y]CN103305140 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [Y] 5, 13-15; | [Y]CN103422356 (TAIJIA GLASS FIBER CO LTD) [Y] 7-9, 13-15; | [XY]CN107513353 (ZHOU LI) [X] 1-4, 6,10-15 [Y] 5, 7-9, 13-15 | by applicant | CN104861889 |