EP3746080 - PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.10.2022 [2022/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corvus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 863 Mitten Road Suite 102 Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | [2020/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Jingrong 863 Mitten Road, Suite 102 Burlingame, California 94010 / US | 02 /
JONES, William 863 Mitten Road, Suite 102 Burlingame, California 94010 / US | 03 /
FLICKER, Felicia 863 Mitten Road, Suite 102 Burlingame, California 94010 / US | 04 /
BERNER, Bret 863 Mitten Road, Suite 102 Burlingame, California 94010 / US | [2020/50] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/50] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 19746980.2 | 01.02.2019 | [2020/50] | WO2019US16284 | Priority number, date | US201862625163P | 01.02.2018 Original published format: US 201862625163 P | [2020/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019152798 | Date: | 08.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3746080 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/14, A61K9/16, A61K9/28, A61K9/48, A61K47/02, A61K47/14, A61K47/26, A61K47/34, A61K47/36, A61K47/38, A61K31/519, A61P35/00 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
A61K9/14 (EP,KR);
A61K31/519 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/02 (EP,US);
A61K47/14 (EP,US);
A61K47/26 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/34 (EP,US);
A61K47/36 (EP,KR);
A61K47/38 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/1623 (EP,KR);
A61K9/1652 (EP,KR);
A61K9/1676 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/1694 (EP,US);
A61K9/28 (EP,US);
A61K9/4808 (EP,KR);
A61K9/4866 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/50] | A61K31/519 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE FORMULIERUNGEN | [2020/50] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATIONS | [2020/50] | French: | FORMULATIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES | [2020/50] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 20.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/50] | 12.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/43] | 13.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2011050160 (BIOGEN IDEC INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 22 - page 24; claim 14; table 1 *; | [I]WO2018013951 (UNIV NORTHWESTERN [US]) [I] 1-15 * page 14, paragraph l - page 15; claims 1,4, 11,13,14,23 *; | [E]EP3520782 (CORVUS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [E] 1-15 * example -; claim - *; | [A] - Aiken Chris, "The impact of particles on pharmaceuticals", (20161128), pages 1 - 3, URL: https://www.outsourcing-pharma.com/Headlines/Promotional-Features/The-impact-of-particles-on-pharmaceuticals, (20211005), XP055847872 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - Anonymous, "Particle Size Specifications for Solid Oral Dosage Forms: A Regulatory Perspective | American Pharmaceutical Review - The Review of American Pharmaceutical Business & Technology", (20100501), URL: http://www.americanpharmaceuticalreview.com/Featured-Articles/36779-Particle-Size-Specifications-for-Solid-Oral-Dosage-Forms-A-Regulatory-Perspective/, (20140130), XP055099380 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2006111334 (MUELLER KRISTINA [DE], et al) [Y] 35-39* ; paragraphs [0045]-[0046] *; | [Y]US2011172252 (BAMFORD SAMANTHA JANE [GB], et al) [Y] 1-7, 15, 18-26, 30-44 * ; paragraphs [0024], [0033], [0114], [0137], [0139], [0144], [0146] *; | [Y]WO2013128283 (ICEUTICA HOLDINGS INC BVI [GB]) [Y] 1-7, 15, 18-26, 30-49 * ; page 4, first and second paragraphs; page 11, third paragraph; page 13, third paragraph; page 60, fifth paragraph *; | [Y]WO2017112917 (CORVUS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [Y] 1, 45-49 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0004]-[0005], [0025], [0276] * |