EP3749151 - MIXER AND BOTTLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/51] | MIXER FOR A SPORTS AND WATER BOTTLE | ||
[2022/48] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Parks, Richard Lynn 2464 South Union Ave. Bakersfield, CA 93307 / US | [2020/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2020/51] | Representative(s) | Maidment, Marc, et al Albright IP Limited County House Bayshill Road Cheltenham, Glos. GL50 3BA / GB | [2020/51] | Application number, filing date | 19747581.7 | 04.02.2019 | [2020/51] | WO2019US16556 | Priority number, date | US201862626320P | 05.02.2018 Original published format: US 201862626320 P | US201862658300P | 16.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862658300 P | US201862685226P | 14.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862685226 P | [2020/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019152954 | Date: | 08.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3749151 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/00, A47J31/44, B65D23/04, A47J43/27, B01F33/25 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
A47J43/27 (EP,US);
B65D23/04 (US);
B01F33/25 (EP);
B01F33/5011 (US);
B01F35/32021 (US)
|
Former IPC [2021/44] | A47J31/00, A47J31/44, B01F13/00, B01F15/00, B65D23/04, A47J43/27 | ||
Former IPC [2020/51] | A47J31/00, A47J31/44, B01F13/00, B01F15/00, B65D23/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/51] | Title | German: | MISCHER UND FLASCHE | [2022/48] | English: | MIXER AND BOTTLE | [2022/48] | French: | MELANGEUR ET BOUTEILLE | [2022/48] |
Former [2020/51] | MISCHER FÜR EINE SPORT- UND WASSERFLASCHE | ||
Former [2020/51] | MIXER FOR A SPORTS AND WATER BOTTLE | ||
Former [2020/51] | MÉLANGEUR DESTINÉ À UNE BOUTEILLE DE SPORT ET D'EAU | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 16.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/51] | 15.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/23] | 31.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4640623 (TOERNELL GOERAN [SE]) [A] 1-15* column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 8; figure -; claim - *; | [YA]US2013201783 (STEWART JOSHUA [US], et al) [Y] 9-15 * paragraphs [0014] - [0028]; figure -; claim - * [A] 1-8; | [YA]US2015290605 (DAYTON ANASTASIA B [US]) [Y] 9-15 * paragraphs [0047] - [0099]; figure -; claim - * [A] 1-8; | [A]US2018000289 (ALMARAZ II VICTOR ANTHONY [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0016] - [0052]; figure -; claim - * | International search | [X]US6379032 (SORENSEN STEVE [US]) [X] 1, 15-19 * , entire document *; | [A]US2006250887 (VERNON ROBERT D [US]) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US2013201783 (STEWART JOSHUA [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US2014119154 (KERSHAW KASEY [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [X]US2015290605 (DAYTON ANASTASIA B [US]) [X] 1-5, 8-12, 14, 20 * , entire document *; | [A]US2017105581 (ENGHARD FLORIAN [DE]) [A] 1-20* , entire document *; | [X]US9706880 (KALAMARAS MICHAEL P [US]) [X] 1, 6-7, 13 * , entire document * | by applicant | US7441941 | US2013201783 | US2014233344 | US2014340979 | US2015290605 | US9723956 |