EP3748429 - CAMERA MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Innotek Co., Ltd. 30, Magokjungang 10-ro Gangseo-gu Seoul 07796 / KR | [2020/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANG, Young Bae 30, Magokjungang 10-ro Gangseo-gu 07796 Seoul / KR | [2020/50] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/50] | Application number, filing date | 19747671.6 | 22.01.2019 | [2020/50] | WO2019KR00912 | Priority number, date | KR20180011062 | 30.01.2018 Original published format: KR 20180011062 | [2020/50] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019151700 | Date: | 08.08.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3748429 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G03B17/12, G03B5/00, G03B13/36, H04N5/225, G02B26/08, G02B7/10, G03B3/10, G03B17/17, G03B30/00 | [2021/44] | CPC: |
G03B30/00 (EP,KR);
G02B7/09 (US);
G02B13/0065 (US);
G02B15/143 (US);
G02B26/0883 (KR);
G02B7/102 (EP);
G03B13/36 (KR,US);
G03B3/10 (EP);
G03B5/00 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/54 (EP);
H04N23/55 (EP);
H04N23/57 (EP);
G03B17/17 (EP);
G03B2205/0007 (EP,KR);
G03B2205/0046 (EP,US);
G03B2205/0053 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/50] | G03B17/12, G03B5/00, G03B13/36, H04N5/225, G02B26/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] | Title | German: | KAMERAMODUL | [2020/50] | English: | CAMERA MODULE | [2020/50] | French: | MODULE D'APPAREIL PHOTO | [2020/50] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2020 | Translation filed | 27.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 27.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/50] | 27.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN2901351Y (LIXIANG OPTICS CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 6,7 * pages 7-8 *; | [X]CN101324692 (SPREADTRUM COMMUNICATIONS INC [CN]) [X] 1 * abstract * * figures 3, 4 * * pages 7-9 *; | [XYI]US2010259836 (KANG KYONG ROK [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,8-15 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0041] , [0 42] * [Y] 6,7 [I] 4,5; | [A]US2014022654 (HARADA SHINICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document * | International search | [XY]KR20100113328 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-5, 8-10 [Y] 6-7; | [A]KR20130042788 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-10; | [A]WO2014042440 (3HVISION CO LTD [KR])[A] 1-10; | [A]KR20150114802 (OPTIS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10; | [Y]KR20160022656 (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 6-7 |