EP3957401 - ARTICULATED AND EXTENDIBLE ROTARY HEAD FOR A PRESSURISED AIR JET SPRAY GUN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cortavitarte Perez, Daniel C/Camino de Meros 4 Escalera 3-3° 33401 Aviles-Asturias / ES | [2022/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | Ungria López, Javier Avda. Ramón y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | [2022/08] | Application number, filing date | 19747722.7 | 01.02.2019 | [2022/08] | WO2019ES00008 | Priority number, date | ES20180000031 | 02.02.2018 Original published format: ES 201800031 | [2022/08] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019149974 | Date: | 08.08.2019 | Language: | ES | [2019/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3957401 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 08.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B05B7/02, B05B1/00, B05B3/00 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
B05B15/652 (EP,US);
B05B1/3046 (EP);
B05B12/002 (US);
B05B15/656 (EP);
B05B7/2478 (EP,US);
B05B7/0815 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] | Validation states | MA | 02.09.2020 | Title | German: | GELENKIGER UND VERLÄNGERBARER DREHKOPF FÜR EINE DRUCKLUFTSTRAHL-SPRITZPISTOLE | [2022/08] | English: | ARTICULATED AND EXTENDIBLE ROTARY HEAD FOR A PRESSURISED AIR JET SPRAY GUN | [2022/08] | French: | EMBOUT ROTATIF EXTENSIBLE ET ARTICULÉ DE PISTOLET DE PULVÉRISATION À JET PAR AIR SOUS PRESSION | [2022/08] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2020 | Translation filed | 04.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 04.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: ES | deleted | Deletion: Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/07] | 03.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/07] | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/08] | 02.09.2020 | Examination requested [2022/08] | 23.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2022/08] | 21.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 04.01.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 04.01.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.01.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees LT, HU, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, IT, IS, IE, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 04.01.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 04.01.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.01.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 04.01.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 04.01.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.01.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9500252 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [A]EP1579919 (NEED BRAIN CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US2014034756 (GANTENBEIN STEFAN [US], et al); | [A]CN205109963U (HUBEI FULAI SCIENCE AND TECH DEV CO LTD) | International search | [A]US4129092 (WIGGINS RICHARD F); | [A]US4494417 (LARSON OVE [SE], et al); | [A]WO9500252 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [A]EP1579919 (NEED BRAIN CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP2255885 (BENDEL WERKZEUGE INHABER FRANK [DE]); | [A]US2014034756 (GANTENBEIN STEFAN [US], et al); | [A]CN205109963U (HUBEI FULAI SCIENCE AND TECH DEV CO LTD); | [A]CN106824590 (DONGZHI WENYUAN CERAM TILE PROC FACTORY) |