EP3746078 - ORAL FORMULATIONS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eustralis Pharmaceuticals Limited (Trading as Pressura Neuro) Suite 3, Level 2 470 Collins Street Melbourne, Victoria 3000 / AU | [2020/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANKAN, Pierre C/- Eustralis Pharmaceuticals Limited (Trading as Pressura Neuro) Suite 3 Level 2, 470 Collins Street Melbourne, Victoria 3000 / AU | 02 /
SASARMAN, Andreea C/- IDT Australia, 45 Wadhurst Drive Melbourne, Victoria 3155 / AU | 03 /
WILLMBRINK, Grasiela Bourscheit C/- IDT Australia Limited 45 Wadhurst Drive Melbourne, Victoria 3155 / AU | [2020/50] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/50] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | Application number, filing date | 19747749.0 | 01.02.2019 | [2020/50] | WO2019AU50076 | Priority number, date | AU20180900324 | 02.02.2018 Original published format: AU 2018900324 | [2020/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019148247 | Date: | 08.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3746078 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 08.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/16, A61K9/20, A61K9/26, A61K9/50, A61K31/496, A61P25/00, A61P9/10, A61P43/00 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
A61K31/496 (EP,AU,US);
A61K9/2081 (EP,US);
A61K9/1611 (EP,US);
A61K9/1617 (US);
A61K9/1623 (EP,US);
A61K9/1641 (EP,US);
A61K9/1652 (EP,US);
A61K9/20 (EP,AU);
A61K9/2009 (EP,AU,US);
A61K9/2013 (AU,US);
A61K9/2018 (EP,AU,US);
A61K9/2054 (EP,AU,US);
A61K9/2059 (EP,AU,US);
A61K9/5047 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP,AU);
|
Former IPC [2020/50] | A61K31/496, A61K9/26, A61P25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] | Title | German: | ORALE FORMULIERUNGEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2020/50] | English: | ORAL FORMULATIONS AND USES THEREOF | [2020/50] | French: | FORMULATIONS ORALES ET UTILISATIONS DE CELLES-CI | [2020/50] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 07.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/50] | 07.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/01] | 25.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2011061622 (HELSINN HEALTHCARE SA [CH], et al) [A] 1-15* page 17, paragraph l - page 18, paragraph 3; example 1; claim 34; table 2 *; | [I]IN2031MUM2013 (NOVOEXCIPIENTS PVT LTD [IN]) [I] 1-15 * example -; claims 1-3,5-8 *; | [A]US2016271126 (BUURMAN STEPHANIE [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0021]; examples 1,2; claim - *; | [A] - Rutesh H. Dave, "Overview of pharmaceutical excipients used in tablets and capsules", Drug TopicsCommunity Pharmacy, (20081024), URL: https://www.pharmaexcipients.com/wp-content/uploads/attachments/Excipients+for+Tablets+2008.pdf?t=1454966695, (20201026), XP055743712 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO2009009829 (ADELAIDE RES & INNOVATION PTY [AU], et al) [A] * See whole document, in particular abstract, Table 1, Table 2, Table 3 and page 24 lines 15-21 *; | [A]WO2015000033 (EUSTRALIS PHARMACEUTICALS LTD TRADING AS PRESSURA NEURO [AU]) [A] * See whole document, in particular abstract, page 4 paragraphs 4-5, page 17 paragraph 1 and pages 19-20 bridging paragraph. * |