EP3751043 - FRAMEWORK OF LAUNDRY PROCESSING DEVICE, AND LAUNDRY PROCESSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qingdao Haier Drum Washing Machine Co., Ltd. No.1 Haier Road Hi-tech Industrial Park Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | For all designated states Haier Smart Home Co., Ltd. No. 1 Haier Road Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | [2020/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Xinhua No.1 Haier Road Hi-tech Industrial Park Laoshan District Qingdao Shandong 266101 / CN | 02 /
LI, Wenwei No.1 Haier Road Hi-tech Industrial Park Laoshan District Qingdao Shandong 266101 / CN | 03 /
XING, Benfu No.1 Haier Road Hi-tech Industrial Park Laoshan District Qingdao Shandong 266101 / CN | 04 /
YI, Shaolei No.1 Haier Road Hi-tech Industrial Park Laoshan District Qingdao Shandong 266101 / CN | 05 /
ZHAO, Zhiwei No.1 Haier Road Hi-tech Industrial Park Laoshan District Qingdao Shandong 266101 / CN | [2020/51] | Representative(s) | Beck & Rössig European Patent Attorneys Denninger Str. 169 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/51] | Beck & Rössig European Patent Attorneys Cuvilliésstraße 14 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19747850.6 | 31.01.2019 | [2020/51] | WO2019CN74154 | Priority number, date | CN201810103574 | 01.02.2018 Original published format: CN201810103574 | CN201810103208 | 01.02.2018 Original published format: CN201810103208 | CN201810148815 | 13.02.2018 Original published format: CN201810148815 | [2020/51] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019149246 | Date: | 08.08.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3751043 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/12, // D06F29/00, D06F31/00 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
D06F29/005 (EP,KR,US);
D06F39/125 (KR);
D06F31/00 (EP,KR,US);
D06F39/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/51] | Title | German: | RAHMEN EINER WÄSCHEVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND WÄSCHEVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/51] | English: | FRAMEWORK OF LAUNDRY PROCESSING DEVICE, AND LAUNDRY PROCESSING DEVICE | [2020/51] | French: | STRUCTURE DE DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE LINGE, ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE LINGE | [2020/51] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2020 | Translation filed | 28.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/51] | 13.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2004097098 (TOLON MAKINA TEKSTIL GIDA SANA [TR], et al); | [XA]CN203741597U (HEFEI ROYALSTAR SANYO ELECTRIC APPLIANCE CO LTD) | International search | [A]JPH07251000 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD)[A] 1-30; | [X]CN101440562 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1, 10-12; | [XY]CN102605586 (SUZHOU HEALTH COLLEGE) [X] 1, 10, 11 [Y] 2-9, 12-15, 17-20; | [X]CN202519474U (SUZHOU HEALTH COLLEGE) [X] 1, 10-12; | [X]CN203741597U (HEFEI ROYALSTAR SANYO ELECTRIC APPLIANCE CO LTD) [X] 1, 10-12; | [Y]CN105019185 (HAIER GROUP TECH R & D CT) [Y] 2-9, 12-15, 17-20; | [PX]CN208038876U (QINGDAO HAIER DRUM WASHING MACHINE CO LTD) [PX] 1-30; | [PX]CN208038877U (QINGDAO HAIER DRUM WASHING MACHINE CO LTD) [PX] 1-30; | [PX]CN208151705U (QINGDAO HAIER DRUM WASHING MACHINE CO LTD) [PX] 1-30; | [PX]CN208151701U (QINGDAO HAIER DRUM WASHING MACHINE CO LTD) [PX] 1-30; | [PX]CN208151675U (QINGDAO HAIER DRUM WASHING MACHINE CO LTD) [PX] 1-30; | [PX]CN208151706U (QINGDAO HAIER DRUM WASHING MACHINE CO LTD) [PX] 1-30; | [PX]CN208151702U (QINGDAO HAIER DRUM WASHING MACHINE CO LTD) [PX] 1-30; | [PX]CN208151703U (QINGDAO HAIER DRUM WASHING MACHINE CO LTD) [PX] 1-30; | [PX]CN208151676U (QINGDAO HAIER DRUM WASHING MACHINE CO LTD) [PX] 1-30; | [PX]CN208151704U (QINGDAO HAIER DRUM WASHING MACHINE CO LTD) [PX] 1-30 |