EP3734640 - SPATIALLY PHASE-MODULATED ELECTRON WAVE GENERATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi High-Tech Corporation 17-1, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6409 / JP | [2020/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUWAHARA Makoto c/o National University Corporation Nagoya University, 1, Furo-cho, Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 464-8601 / JP | 02 /
SAITOH Koh c/o National University Corporation Nagoya University, 1, Furo-cho, Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 464-8601 / JP | [2020/45] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2020/45] | Application number, filing date | 19748111.2 | 21.01.2019 | [2020/45] | WO2019JP01715 | Priority number, date | JP20180016410 | 01.02.2018 Original published format: JP 2018016410 | [2020/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019151025 | Date: | 08.08.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3734640 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/073, G02B21/32, H01J37/26 | [2020/45] | CPC: |
H01J37/073 (EP,US);
H01J37/10 (US);
H01J37/153 (US);
H01J37/26 (EP,US);
H03F1/02 (US);
H03F3/24 (US);
H04B1/04 (US);
H04L25/03012 (US);
H04L25/03343 (US);
H04L27/08 (US);
H04L27/2647 (US);
H04L27/368 (US);
H04W56/0035 (US);
H01J2237/06333 (EP);
H01J2237/0653 (EP);
H01J2237/1534 (US);
H01J2237/2482 (EP);
H01J2237/2614 (EP);
H04B2001/0408 (US);
H04B2001/045 (US);
H04W74/004 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] | Title | German: | RÄUMLICH PHASENMODULIERTE ELEKTRONENWELLENERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/45] | English: | SPATIALLY PHASE-MODULATED ELECTRON WAVE GENERATION DEVICE | [2020/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'ONDES D'ÉLECTRONS À MODULATION DE PHASE SPATIALE | [2020/45] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2020 | Translation filed | 29.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 29.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 28.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 21.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5932966 (SCHNEIDER JAMES E [US], et al) [A] 3 * abstract * * column 4, line 58 - column 9, line 52; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]JP2010218868 (JAPAN SYNCHROTRON RADIATION RES INST, et al) [Y] 10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0048] - [0140]; figures 1-15 *; | [XYI]WO2017168554 (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP [JP]) [X] 2,3,5-9,11 * abstract * * figures 1,3,4,6,7 * [Y] 4,10 [I] 4; | US2020303152 [ ] (OHSHIMA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [ ] * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] - [0049]; figures 1,3,4,6,7 *; | [Y] - NISHITANI T ET AL, "Highly polarized electrons from GaAs-GaAsP and InGaAs-AlGaAs strained-layer superlattice photocathodes", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, US, (20050420), vol. 97, no. 9, doi:10.1063/1.1886888, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 94907 - 094907, XP012071255 [Y] 4,10 * abstract * * page 1, column r, paragraph l - page 6, column r, paragraph 1; figures 1,2; tables I,III * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1886888 | International search | [Y]JP2004506296 [Y] 5, 15 * , [0022] - [0023], 1 US 6 column 5 line 64 - column6 line 21, figure 1 & WO 2 A2 1 & EP 1309983 A2 & AU & KR 10-2003-0029 *; | [Y]JP2013244527 (PANASONIC CORP) [Y] 10, 20* , *; | [XYA]WO2017168554 (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP [JP]) [X] 1-2, 4, 8, 11, 13-14, 18-19 * , -t r- ^ | Õ'\ ^ ......... (1 /n T * [Y] 5, 10, 15, 20 [A] 3, 6-7, 9, 12, 16-17 | by applicant | JPH0651340 | JP2004506296 | JP2006331901 | JP2007258119 | WO2011122171 | JP2016538681 | - H. KASHIMA et al., Proc. PASJ4/LAM32, (20070801), pages 721 - 723 | - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (20140000), vol. 105, page 193101 | - YOSHIO OIKAWA, Super Resolution Microscope Technology and Applied Microscope, (20120000), vol. 47, no. 4, pages 2 38 - 240 | - KONDO, "High Resolution Strained Analysis Method Using Moire Fringes By STEM Scanning Lines And Crystal Lattice", Microscope, (20140000), vol. 49, no. 3 | - NOBUO TANAKA, Current Status and Future Prospects of Aberration-corrected TEM/STEM Microscope, (20110000), vol. 46, no. 3, pages 175 - 180 | - NOBUO TANAKA, Resolution Improvement of High Resolution Electron Microscopy by Spherical Aberration Correction Journal of the Crystallography of Japan, (20050000), vol. 47, no. 1, pages 20 - 25 | - MASAMI YAMAGUCHI, Virus Observation by Phase Difference Electron Microscope Microscope, (20080000), vol. 43, no. 2, pages 115 - 120 | - TAKAHASHI, "Improvement of Fourier Iterative Method for Phase Retrieval", Optics, (20030000), vol. 32, no. 1, pages 39 - 45, XP002994405 | - KAZUFUMI MIMURA, "Compressed sensing-Reconstruction of Sparse Information and Algorithm Thereof", RIMS Kokyuroku, (20120000), vol. 1803, pages 26 - 56 | - DAISUKE KOZAKI, "Restoration of Magnetic Resonance Image by Adaptive Compressed sensing Algorithm", 306th Research Meeting of Society of Instrument and Control Engineers Tohoku Branch, (20161210), pages 1 - 4 | - AKIRA SAITO, Generation, Propagation | - "Interference of Electron Waves Having Spiral Wavefront", Microscope, (20130000), vol. 48, no. 1, pages 39 - 46 |