EP3747863 - PROBUCOL DERIVATIVE, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEMOTECH.INC. 910 BYBP, Yizhuang Beijing 101111 / CN | [2020/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Song BYBP, 3 -910, No. 88 Kechuang 6th Str., BDA, Daxing District Beijing 101111 / CN | 02 /
XIE, Wenwei BYBP, 3 -910, No. 88 Kechuang 6th Str., BDA, Daxing District Beijing 101111 / CN | 03 /
HE, Shuangjiang BYBP, 3 -910, No. 88 Kechuang 6th Str., BDA, Daxing District Beijing 101111 / CN | [2020/50] | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [2020/50] | Application number, filing date | 19748126.0 | 18.01.2019 | [2020/50] | WO2019CN72315 | Priority number, date | CN20181090320 | 30.01.2018 Original published format: CN201810090320 | [2020/50] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019149091 | Date: | 08.08.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3747863 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07C323/52, C07D311/58, C07D495/04, C07D295/088, C07D339/04, C07D249/08, A61K31/216, A61K31/192, A61K31/10, A61P3/10, A61P1/16 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
C07D311/58 (EP,CN,US);
C07C323/52 (EP,CN);
C07D265/30 (US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07C323/20 (EP,CN);
C07C323/22 (US);
C07C323/31 (EP);
C07C323/32 (EP,CN);
C07C323/49 (EP,CN);
C07D249/08 (EP,CN,US);
C07D295/088 (EP,CN);
C07D339/04 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] | Title | German: | PROBUCOLDERIVAT, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2020/50] | English: | PROBUCOL DERIVATIVE, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR AND USE THEREOF | [2020/50] | French: | DÉRIVÉ DE PROBUCOL, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET SON UTILISATION | [2020/50] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2020 | Translation filed | 10.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 10.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/50] | 20.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/35] | 03.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US6121319 (SOMERS PATRICIA K [US]) [XD] 1,2,4,8-10 * See claims and examples *; | [X]US2003176511 (STOCKER ROLAND [AU]) [X] 1,2,4,7,9,10 * See pars. 10, 21; claim 8 *; | [XD]WO2007044726 (ATHEROGENICS INC [US], et al) [XD] 1,2,4,8-10* See all compounds exemplified therein and chemical formula *; | [X]CN101686676 (ATHEROGENICS INC) [X] 1-10 * See compounds and general formula disclosed in pages 13, 15-16 and 34-35; see also compound B-29; claims *; | [X]WO2011019747 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,9 * See compounds 16, 17, page 21; claim 6 * | International search | [X]US2003176511 (STOCKER ROLAND [AU]) [X] 1, 2, 7, 9-10 * claims 6 and 8 *; | [X]WO2007044726 (ATHEROGENICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1, 4, 6-7, 9-10 * claims 1 and 63 *; | [X]WO2007142581 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [X] 1, 4, 6-7, 9-10* claims 1-5 *; | [XA]CN101284808 (ATHEROGENICS INC [US]) [X] 1-4, 6-7, 9-10 * claims 1-38 * * claims 1-38 * [A] 5-10,; | [X]CN101686676 (ATHEROGENICS INC) [X] 1, 7, 9-10 * claims 1-27, and description, page 24, paragraph 3 *; | [X]WO2011019747 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US], et al) [X] 1, 4, 7, 9 * claim 6 *; | [PX]CN108299263 (DEMO TECH INC) [PX] 1-10 * claims 1-10 * | by applicant | US3862332 | US4985465 | US5262439 | WO9809781 | US6121319 | US2003064967 | WO2007044726 | US9650332 | CN19988007171 | CN20088007795 | CN20088016419 |